This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/08/2022 at 13:09:05 (UTC).

Allana Buick & Bers, Inc. vs Bay Mountain Air, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/26/2017 Allana Buick Bers, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Bay Mountain Air, Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Zayner, Theodore C, Takaichi, Drew C and Pierce, Mark H. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8260

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Zayner, Theodore C

Takaichi, Drew C

Pierce, Mark H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Allana Buick & Bers, Inc.

Defendant

Bay Mountain Air, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robertson, Catherine Schlomann

Robertson, Catherine S.

Catherine S. Robertson

Defendant Attorneys

Carroll, Bryce Daniel

Bryce Daniel Carroll

 

Court Documents

Review: Mediation Status

5/16/2019 Review: Mediation Status

Summons: Issued/Filed

10/26/2017 Summons: Issued/Filed

Petition (Limited): >$10K and <$25K

10/26/2017 Petition (Limited): >$10K and <$25K

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/26/2017 Civil Case Cover Sheet

New Filed Case

10/26/2017 New Filed Case

Answer (Limited): >$10K and <$25K

12/20/2017 Answer (Limited): >$10K and <$25K

Statement: Case Management Conference

1/30/2018 Statement: Case Management Conference

Statement: Case Management Conference

1/31/2018 Statement: Case Management Conference

Minute Order

2/13/2018 Minute Order

Declaration: In Support

6/15/2018 Declaration: In Support

Minute Order

5/17/2019 Minute Order

Declaration: In Support

5/31/2019 Declaration: In Support

Statement: Settlement Conference

5/31/2019 Statement: Settlement Conference

Statement: Settlement Conference

5/31/2019 Statement: Settlement Conference

Stipulation

6/7/2019 Stipulation

Minute Order

6/10/2019 Minute Order

Request: Dismissal

9/25/2019 Request: Dismissal

Writ: Execution (Filed)

1/24/2020 Writ: Execution (Filed)

70 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Writ: Execution (Filed); Filed By: Allana Buick & Bers, Inc.,; Comment: Santa Clara, Unsatisfied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: Allana Buick & Bers, Inc.,; Comment: entire with prejudice by atty Robertson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Reserved; Department: Department 2; Time: 2:00PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation; Filed By: Catherine Robertson, Bryce Carroll, Allana Buick & Bers, Inc., Bay Mountain Air, Inc.,; Comment: re: Settlement (Catherine Robertson & Bryce Carroll)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: In Support; Filed By: Allana Buick & Bers, Inc.,; Comment: Hearing N/A-Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Settlement Conference; Filed By: Allana Buick & Bers, Inc.,; Comment: Hearing N/A-Mandatory Settlement Conference Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Settlement Conference; Filed By: Bay Mountain Air, Inc.,; Comment: Defendant Bay Mountain Air, Inc.'s Mandatory Settlement Conference Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Review: Mediation Status; Department: Department 2; Time: 10:30AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: In Support; Filed By: Bay Mountain Air, Inc.,; Comment: of Bryce D. Carrol

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 16; Time: 3:45PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Allana Buick & Bers, Inc.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Bay Mountain Air, Inc.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Limited): >$10K and <$25K; Filed By: Bay Mountain Air, Inc.,; Comment: to Unverified Complaint. Atty. Carroll.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Petition (Limited): >$10K and <$25K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allana Buick & Bers, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where BAY MOUNTAIN AIR, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARROLL, BRYCE D.