Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 06:35:13 (UTC).

ALICE LEE vs JANET STEVENS et al

Case Summary

On 07/26/2018 ALICE LEE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JANET STEVENS. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Overton, Carol. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1986

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Overton, Carol

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEE, ALICE

Defendants

STEVENS, JANET L

STEVENS, NATHAN

Not Classified By Court

All Unnamed Occupants

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paris, Daniel T.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Judgment Type: Clerk Default Judgment (CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: LEE, ALICE; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 10598 Santa Lucia Rd, Cupertino, CA 95014; Awarded Against: STEVENS, JANET L; STEVENS, NATHAN; Party: Names: LEE, ALICE; STEVENS, JANET L; STEVENS, NATHAN; All Unnamed Occupants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • Writ: Possession (Filed) - Comment: issued 8/16/18, satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • Writ: Possession (Issued) - Comment: 10598 Santa Lucia Rd, Cupertino, CA 95014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • Default Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: JANET L. STEVENS- PJC SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: NATHAN STEVENS- PJC SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: ALL OCCUPANTS- PJC SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • Judgment: Default - Comment: 10598 Santa Lucia Rd, Cupertino CA 95014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • UD Masking Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • UD Masking Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • UD Masking Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • UD Masking Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • UD Masking Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • Complaint-Unlawful Detainer (Limited): Up to $10K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less