This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 12:52:23 (UTC).

Alice Hong vs Yinyu Ye

Case Summary

On 10/04/2018 Alice Hong filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Yinyu Ye. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth and Pierce, Mark H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6003

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Pierce, Mark H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hong, Alice

Defendant

Ye, Yinyu

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Yang, Nicholas

Defendant Attorney

Polito, Dominic M.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2019
  • Review: Civil Early Settlement Conf Status - Judicial Officer: Pierce, Mark H; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Review: Mediation Status - Judicial Officer: Pierce, Mark H; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Proof of Service: Mail - Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Conference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Pierce, Mark H; Hearing Time: 3:45 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Referral: Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • Demand: Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: to complaint: atty Polito

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: Partial, Without Prejudice, as to the Punitive Damages Claim in the Complaint ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of service summons & complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less