This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 12:31:11 (UTC).

Alexis Urena-Cardenas vs Adam Cardenas

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 Alexis Urena-Cardenas filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Adam Cardenas. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Rudy, Christopher G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0172

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Rudy, Christopher G

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Urena-Cardenas, Alexis

Respondent

Cardenas, Adam

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2018
  • Notice: Case Status

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • Declaration: Property - Comment: (p)-Separate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • Declaration: Property - Comment: (P)-commuinty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • Declaration: Income and Expense

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • Response: Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Declaration: Re: Diligence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Proof of Service: Non Service - Comment: Temporary restraining order...

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • Request for Order: Domestic Violence - Judicial Officer: Rudy, Christopher G; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Matter Heard; Comment: (r) all denied, cont per 3-7-18 min-cc

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2018
  • Proof of Service: Personal - Comment: (P) DV109, DV100, DV120, DV110, FL150, FM1013, FM1050, FL110, FL100, FL105, FL155, DV250 & DV800-mag

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DV Continuance - Comment: (P) 1st reiss from 2/14/18 per DV-116 filed-mag

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • Proof of Service: Personal - Comment: DV 100,110,109

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • Declaration: Income and Expense

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • Request: Domestic Violence Restraining Order - Comment: (p) partly granted and partly denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • Fee Waiver Order-Grant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Fee Waiver Application

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Petition: Dissolution

    Read MoreRead Less