This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 06:52:01 (UTC).

Alexander Polovinko vs Volha Polovinko

Case Summary

On 09/05/2017 Alexander Polovinko filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Volha Polovinko. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Hayashi, Roberta S. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3684

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Hayashi, Roberta S

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Polovinko, Alexander

Respondent

Polovinko, Volha

Minors

Polovinko, Miroslava

Polovinko, Bozhena Alexa

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Hayashi, Roberta S; Judgment Type: Judgment/order (FL); Party: Names: Polovinko, Alexander; Polovinko, Volha; Polovinko, Miroslava; Polovinko, Bozhena Alexa

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • Notice: Entry of Judgment w/POS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • Judgment: Dissolution/FC2336

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • Declaration for default filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • FC 2336 Packet Received for Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • Declaration: Income and Expense

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • Request: Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.