This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/24/2019 at 07:07:15 (UTC).

Alexander Miller vs Fiat Chrysler Automobile LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2018 Alexander Miller filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Fiat Chrysler Automobile LLC. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth, Kirwan, Peter and Rudy, Christopher G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3422

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Kirwan, Peter

Rudy, Christopher G

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Miller, Alexander

Defendants

Cal's Jeep

Fiat Chrysler Automobile LLC

Stevens Creek Jeep

Carl Burgers Jeep

Fremont Jeep

Normandin Jeep

Sam's Riverside Auto Inc

My Jeep

Putnam Jeep

FCA US LLC

San Leandro Jeep

My Jeep Chrysler Dodge

Normandin's

Normandin Chrysler Jeep Dodge

Carl Burger Dodge Chrysler Jeep Ram World

Burger Auto Group, LLC

STEVENS CREEK CHRYSLER JEEP DODGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Berberich, Daniel Francis

Stearns, Andrew Vinson

Hathaway, Sterling Samuel

Busser, Norine Marsi

Roubinian, Leon Vram

Reisenaur, Peter

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2019
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Name: Miller, Alexander; Comment: No Dismissal Filed/Entered in Error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • Reserved: Demurrer - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Demurrer to amended Complaint by Def. FCA US LLC (Leon Roubinian) Angela 415-984-8295; 8/19/19rb

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • Reserved: Demurrer - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: to the Second Amended Complaint by Ded. Normandin's (Andrew Stearns) Crystal 408-214-6432; 8/12/19rb

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Comment: *continued from 06/25/19*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • Reserved: Demurrer - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: to 2nd Amended Complaint by Def. My Jeep (Norine Busser 415-227-2308) TT 07/19/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • Clerk Rejection Letter - Comment: Envelope #: 03249728 - Please submit a caption page on top of your Proof of Service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • Proof of Service: Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • Declaration - Comment: RE: MEET AND CONFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • Memorandum: Points and Authorities

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • Demurrer - Comment: TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, Atty Roubinian, 10-31-19, 9AM, D19

    Read MoreRead Less
88 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: HRNG: 12/04/2018 Amended Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement HRG 12/4/18 @3PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • Complaint: Amended - Comment: FIRST AMENDED. Pro Se

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • Clerk Rejection Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Carl Burger Dodge Chrysler Jeep RAM World is a litigant

Latest cases where Burger Auto Group LLC; DBA : Carl Burger Dodge Chrysler Jeep Ram World is a litigant

Latest cases where Normandin's is a litigant

Latest cases where NORMANDIN CHRYSLER JEEP DODGE is a litigant