Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 05/01/2021 at 15:41:41 (UTC).

Ochoa v. Lucile Salter Packard Children's Hospital at Stanford et al.

Case Summary

On 05/07/2020 Ochoa filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Lucile Salter Packard Children's Hospital at Stanford. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Mikkelsen, Laurie and Manoukian, Socrates P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6578

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Mikkelsen, Laurie

Manoukian, Socrates P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OCHOA, ALEXA

Defendants

KOLTAI, PETER JOHN, MD

STANFORD CHILDREN'S HEALTH

Lucile Salter Packard Children's Hospital at Stanford

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shahrokh, Koorosh Kaikhosrow

Defendant Attorney

Northrop, Carolyn L.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketConference: Trial Setting - Judicial Officer: Manoukian, Socrates P; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketConference: Further Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Further Case Management; Judicial Officer: Manoukian, Socrates P; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketAdvance jury fee (Nonrefundable) - Comment: $150 jury fees paid for defts, Lucile Salter Packard Children's Hospital at Stanford and Peter Koltai, MD, by atty Northrop.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketStatement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Defendants' Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketStatement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketSubstitution: Attorney - Comment: Substitution of Attorney for Defendant Peter John Koltai, M.D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketSubstitution: Attorney - Comment: Substitution of Attorney for Defendant Lucile Salter Packard Children's Hospital at Stanford

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketAnswer (Limited): >$10K and <$25K - Comment: to FAC. Atty Northrop

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketAmended Complaint Filed - No Fee - Comment: FIRST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketConference: Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Case Management; Judicial Officer: Manoukian, Socrates P; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketStatement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketSummons: Issued/Filed - Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketApplication and Order: Appoint Guardian ad Litem

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver Order-Grant - Comment: signed by clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver Application

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketComplaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketPetition (Limited): >$10K and <$25K

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lucile Salter Packard Children's Hospital at Stanford is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Northrop, Carolyn L.