This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/07/2022 at 00:02:11 (UTC).

Alex Borja et al vs ENTERPRISE PLAN B INC. et al

Case Summary

On 11/09/2017 Alex Borja filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ENTERPRISE PLAN B INC. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8915

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Alex Borja

Eugenia Serrano Borja

Defendants and Not Yet Classified

City of San Jose

Victor Bringas Construction

Not Yet Classified

VOEKS, INC.

ENTERPRISE PLAN B INC.

City of San Jose

James Richard Brown

DIANE STEMBER RICHARDS

LANCE BROWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Hugh Robert Burns

John Phillip Boggs

Defendant Attorneys

P. Christian Scheley

Courtney Herrity O'Brien

John Burke

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

David Raymond Casady

Eric J. Bengtson

Christian B. Nielsen

Matthew Charles Jaime

 

Court Documents

Review: Case Status

8/4/2022 Review: Case Status

Review: Case Status

8/4/2022 Review: Case Status

Review: Case Status

8/4/2022 Review: Case Status

Review: Case Status

8/4/2022 Review: Case Status

Review: Case Status

8/4/2022 Review: Case Status

Review: Case Status

8/4/2022 Review: Case Status

Review: Case Status

8/4/2022 Review: Case Status

Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

12/16/2021 Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

12/16/2021 Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

Summons: Issued/Filed

11/9/2017 Summons: Issued/Filed

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

11/9/2017 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/9/2017 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Declaration: Re: Diligence

1/5/2018 Declaration: Re: Diligence

Proof of Service: Mail

1/22/2018 Proof of Service: Mail

Statement: Case Management Conference

1/22/2018 Statement: Case Management Conference

Declaration

1/22/2018 Declaration

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

1/29/2018 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Minute Order

2/27/2018 Minute Order

311 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Review: Case Status; Department: Department 20; Time: 10:00AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: Dismissal after settlement; Department: Department 20; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Appeal: Notice of Completion; Comment: H048996

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appeal: Receipt for Record; Comment: H048996

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Appeal: Clerk's Certificate of Compliance; Comment: H048996

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Appeal: Receipt for Record; Comment: H049278

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appeal: Notice of Completion; Comment: H049278

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Appeal: Clerk's Certificate of Compliance; Comment: H049278

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Appeal deposit for clerk's transcript; Filed By: City of San Jose,; Comment: H048996 - $647 check deposited for clerk's transcripts (estimated costs) by Respondent, City of San Jose.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
279 More Docket Entries
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Alex Borja, Eugenia Borja, James Brown,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Mail; Filed By: Alex Borja, Eugenia Borja,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Hugh Burns, Alex Borja, Eugenia Borja,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Declaration; Filed By: Alex Borja, Eugenia Borja,; Comment: Of Robin Carvallo Re: Declaration of Diligence to Attempt Personal Service of Summons and Complaint; Proof of Service By First Class United States Mail and Proof of Service By Substituted Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Re: Diligence; Filed By: Alex Borja, Eugenia Borja, James Brown,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less