This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/13/2022 at 05:54:14 (UTC).

Alex Borja et al vs City of San Jose

Case Summary

On 06/15/2018 Alex Borja filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against City of San Jose. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Other - Consolidated.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0071

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Alex Borja

Eugenia Serrano Borja

Defendants

City of San Jose

Victor Bringas Construction

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hugh Robert Burns

Defendant Attorneys

Courtney Herrity O'Brien

John Burke

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

10/15/2018 Minute Order

Notice: Change Address/Firm Name

9/28/2018 Notice: Change Address/Firm Name

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

9/24/2018 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Statement: Case Management Conference

9/14/2018 Statement: Case Management Conference

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

6/15/2018 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/15/2018 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons: Issued/Filed

6/15/2018 Summons: Issued/Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Change Address/Firm Name; Filed By: Alex Borja, Eugenia Borja,; Comment: Notice of Change of Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 9; Time: 1:30PM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Alex Borja, Eugenia Borja,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Alex Borja, Eugenia Borja,; Comment: Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Alex Borja, Eugenia Borja,; Comment: Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Alex Borja, Eugenia Borja,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Alex Borja, Eugenia Borja,; Comment: Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less