This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 12:31:27 (UTC).

Alejandro Ruiz et al vs Wedgewood Manor Homeowners Association

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 Alejandro Ruiz filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against Wedgewood Manor Homeowners Association. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Arand, Mary E, Kulkarni, Sunil R and Strickland, Elizabeth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1864

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Arand, Mary E

Kulkarni, Sunil R

Strickland, Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Threadgill Investments LLC

Wang, Laura

Yu, Charles

Jamison, Kathleen

Aparece, Henedina Uy

Bradshaw, Karin

Uy, Dina

Baker, Leon

Ruiz, Alejandro

Jamison, Elton

Defendant

Wedgewood Manor Homeowners Association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Berger, A. Alan

Defendant Attorney

Chen, Andy Y.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Names: Ruiz, Alejandro; Baker, Leon; Aparece, Henedina Uy; Wang, Laura; Yu, Charles; Jamison, Elton; Bradshaw, Karin; Threadgill Investments LLC; Jamison, Kathleen; Wedgewood Manor Homeowners Association; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • Hearing: Dismissal after settlement - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • Court Trial: Long Cause - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Est. 2 days ***No MSC***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • Notice: Settlement - Comment: Notice: Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • Order After Hearing - POS - Comment: HRG 6/12/18 - Order Denying Motion for Preliminary Injunction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • Conference: Trial Setting - Original Type: Conference: Trial Setting; Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • Hearing: OSC TRO/Preliminary Injunction - Judicial Officer: Kulkarni, Sunil R; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • Stipulation and Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore - Comment: K Chok

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 05/14/2018
  • Order: Ex Parte - Comment: Application for an order setting motion for preliminary injuction and briefing schedule is GRANTED and shall be heard on 6/11/18 at a time and department to be determined, signed Judge Arand.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • Ex Parte Application - Notice Required - Comment: Application for an order setting motion for preliminary injuction and briefing schedule, by atty Berger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Conference: Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Case Management; Judicial Officer: Strickland, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: to complaint; Atty Chen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less