This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/23/2022 at 12:03:38 (UTC).

ALCAL SPECIALTY CONTRACTING, INC. vs DEACON CORP. et al

Case Summary

On 10/08/2019 ALCAL SPECIALTY CONTRACTING, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DEACON CORP. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mikkelsen, Laurie. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6350

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mikkelsen, Laurie

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALCAL SPECIALTY CONTRACTING, INC.

Defendants

DEACON CORP.

MILPITAS DISCTICT 1 ASSOCIATES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ruano, Martin

Martin Ruano

 

Court Documents

Request: Dismissal

4/9/2020 Request: Dismissal

Minute Order

2/10/2020 Minute Order

Clerk Rejection Letter

2/5/2020 Clerk Rejection Letter

Statement: Case Management Conference

1/29/2020 Statement: Case Management Conference

Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee

1/6/2020 Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

11/22/2019 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

11/22/2019 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

10/8/2019 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Summons: Issued/Filed

10/8/2019 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/8/2019 Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: ALCAL SPECIALTY CONTRACTING, INC.,; Comment: entire with prejudice by atty Ruano

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Clerk Rejection Letter; Filed By: MILPITAS DISCTICT 1 ASSOCIATES LLC,; Comment: RE: Stip & Order: The document requires a $870.00 Filing Fee or Waiver of Fees granted by this Court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 20; Time: 3:00PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: ALCAL SPECIALTY CONTRACTING, INC.,; Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee; Filed By: ALCAL SPECIALTY CONTRACTING, INC.,; Comment: First amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: ALCAL SPECIALTY CONTRACTING, INC.,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: ALCAL SPECIALTY CONTRACTING, INC.,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: ALCAL SPECIALTY CONTRACTING, INC.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: ALCAL SPECIALTY CONTRACTING, INC.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: ALCAL SPECIALTY CONTRACTING, INC.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALCAL SPECIALTY CONTRACTING, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Deacon Corp., a California corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUANO, MARTIN