This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/05/2022 at 12:04:49 (UTC).

Alcal Specialty Contracting, Inc. vs BBI-Con, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/16/2017 Alcal Specialty Contracting, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BBI-Con, Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Folan, Maureen A, Strickland, Elizabeth and Kirwan, Peter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0284

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Folan, Maureen A

Strickland, Elizabeth

Kirwan, Peter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alcal Specialty Contracting, Inc.

Defendants

BBI-Con, Inc.

Western Surety Company

Cross Defendants

Bjork Construction Company, Inc.

Select Mechanical

Not Yet Classified

Southwest Hazard Control, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Plaintiff, Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Chan, Phillip

Johnson, Karen Mayann

Perrino, Rudy R

Adjemian, Ani

Anderson, Stephen Kreisel

Stephen Kreisel Anderson

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

McInerney, William H., Jr.

William H. McInerney

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

McInerney, William H., Jr.

Chan, Phillip

Johnson, Karen Mayann

Perrino, Rudy R

Adjemian, Ani

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Karen Mayann Johnson

Rudy R Perrino

Ani Adjemian

Other Attorneys

Souza, James Patrick

Phillip Chan

James Patrick Souza

 

Court Documents

Conference: Trial Setting

9/3/2019 Conference: Trial Setting

Conference: Trial Setting

9/3/2019 Conference: Trial Setting

Conference: Trial Setting

9/3/2019 Conference: Trial Setting

Conference: Trial Setting

9/3/2019 Conference: Trial Setting

Review: Mediation Status

5/2/2019 Review: Mediation Status

Review: Mediation Status

5/2/2019 Review: Mediation Status

Review: Mediation Status

5/2/2019 Review: Mediation Status

Review: Mediation Status

5/2/2019 Review: Mediation Status

Review: Mediation Status

1/10/2019 Review: Mediation Status

Review: Mediation Status

1/10/2019 Review: Mediation Status

Review: Mediation Status

1/10/2019 Review: Mediation Status

Review: Mediation Status

1/10/2019 Review: Mediation Status

Review: Mediation Status

5/31/2018 Review: Mediation Status

Review: Mediation Status

5/31/2018 Review: Mediation Status

Review: Mediation Status

5/31/2018 Review: Mediation Status

Review: Mediation Status

5/31/2018 Review: Mediation Status

Review: Mediation Status

2/8/2018 Review: Mediation Status

Review: Mediation Status

2/8/2018 Review: Mediation Status

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS; Filed By: BBI-Con, Inc.,; Comment: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: Southwest Hazard Control, Inc,; Comment: with prejudice by atty Perino as to cross complaint fied by Southwest Hazard Control

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: Alcal Specialty Contracting, Inc.,; Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Comment: partial with prejudice by atty McInerney as to cross complaint filed by BBI-Con Inc. only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: Alcal Specialty Contracting, Inc.,; Comment: partial with prejudice by atty Hedget as to cross complaint filed by Alcal Specialty only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Mail; Filed By: Alcal Specialty Contracting, Inc.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Settlement; Filed By: Alcal Specialty Contracting, Inc.,; Comment: of Entire Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Trial Setting; Department: Department 19; Time: 11:00AM; Result: Continued: Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
49 More Docket Entries
  • 06/21/2017
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Alcal Specialty Contracting, Inc., BBI-Con, Inc.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • DocketDescription: Cross-Complaint; Filed By: Alcal Specialty Contracting, Inc., BBI-Con, Inc.,; Comment: *dismisssed 4-8-20 *summons issued*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Western Surety Company,; Comment: atty: William McInerney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: BBI-Con, Inc.,; Comment: atty: William McInerney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Alcal Specialty Contracting, Inc., BBI-Con, Inc.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Alcal Specialty Contracting, Inc., Western Surety Company,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bjork Construction Company, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where ALCAL SPECIALTY CONTRACTING, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Western Surety Company is a litigant