This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/15/2023 at 20:27:32 (UTC).

Alba Vera-Velasquez vs John Chan

Case Summary

On 12/15/2022 Alba Vera-Velasquez filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against John Chan. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8681

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alba De La Merced Vera-Velasquez

Defendant

John Chan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Colin Matthew Jones

Defendant Attorney

Deborah T. Bjonerud

 

Court Documents

Summons: Issued/Filed

12/15/2022 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/15/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

12/15/2022 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

1/5/2023 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)

1/13/2023 Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)

Notice: Remote Appearance

1/31/2023 Notice: Remote Appearance

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

1/31/2023 Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2023
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 16; Time: 1:30PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: John Chan,; Comment: To complaint, atty : Bjonerud

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Remote Appearance; Filed By: John Chan,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable); Filed By: Alba Vera-Velasquez,; Comment: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Alba Vera-Velasquez,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Alba Vera-Velasquez,; Comment: Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Alba Vera-Velasquez,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Alba Vera-Velasquez,; Comment: Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less