This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 04/27/2021 at 13:44:05 (UTC).

AK CONSTRUCTION ENTERPRISES, INC., a California Corporation vs Vivienne Tran et al

Case Summary

On 11/18/2020 AK CONSTRUCTION ENTERPRISES, INC , a California Corporation filed an Other lawsuit against Vivienne Tran. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Mikkelsen, Laurie, Monahan, William and Manoukian, Socrates P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3708

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Mikkelsen, Laurie

Monahan, William

Manoukian, Socrates P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

AK CONSTRUCTION ENTERPRISES, INC., a California Corporation

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

DOES 1 through 50, inclusive,

Tran, Vivienne

Phan, Trung

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Ratner, Robin Beth

Gagliasso, Robert Mario

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Sweet, Jonathan Justin

Borger, Joshua J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketHearing: Motion hearings - Judicial Officer: Manoukian, Socrates P; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Motion to Expung Plt's Mechanic's Lien by defs Vivienne Tran and Trung Phan (Joshua Borger)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketHearing: Motion hearings - Judicial Officer: Manoukian, Socrates P; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Motion to Expunge Plt's Lis Pendens by Defs Vivienne Tran and Trung Phan (Joshua Borger)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketNotice - Comment: Amended Notice of Motion and Motion to Expunge Plaintiff's Mechanic's Lien

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketNotice - Comment: Amended Notice of Motion and Motion to Expunge Plaintiff's Lis Pendens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketConference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Monahan, William; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketNotice: Association/Co-Counsel - Comment: associates Robert M. Gagliasso from Law Offices of Bustamante & Gagliasso APC as counsel for AK Construction Enterprises Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketStatement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketStatement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketAnswer: Cross Complaint - Comment: Cross-Defendant's Answer to Cross-Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketAnswer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: to Complaint. Atty Sweet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint - Comment: of Phan & Tran. Atty Sweet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketSummons: Issued/Filed - Comment: to Cross-Complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketNotice: Pendency of Action - Comment: NOTICE OF (LIS PENDENS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketSummons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketComplaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sweet, Jonathan Justin

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Borger, Joshua J