This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/16/2023 at 05:54:31 (UTC).

ADEEL AMIN vs GENERAL MOTORS LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company et al

Case Summary

On 12/30/2022 ADEEL AMIN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9384

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ADEEL AMIN

Defendants

GENERAL MOTORS LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company

DGDG 4, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Adam Martin Zolonz

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/30/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons: Issued/Filed

12/30/2022 Summons: Issued/Filed

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

12/30/2022 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

1/10/2023 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2023
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 10; Time: 3:45PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: ADEEL AMIN,; Comment: Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: ADEEL AMIN,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: ADEEL AMIN,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: ADEEL AMIN,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less