Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 05/02/2021 at 06:46:37 (UTC).

Adami v. Prime Now LLC

Case Summary

On 04/08/2021 Adami filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Prime Now LLC. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lucas, Patricia M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9287

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lucas, Patricia M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Adami, Sima

Defendant

Prime Now LLC

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hollis, Graham Stephen

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

2021 04 22 GH POS of Summons - Prime Now LLC.pdf: Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

Order: Deeming Case Complex

Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline: Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/PML.

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies): Comment: Complaint for Damages, Penalties, Restitution and Injunctive Relief

Civil Lawsuit Notice

Civil Lawsuit Notice: Comment: 1st CMC set for 8/4/21 at 2:30pm D3; assigned to Hon. Patricia M. Lucas for all purposes.

Summons: Issued/Filed

Summons: Issued/Filed:

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet:

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketConference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Lucas, Patricia M; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Comment: (1st CMC) Proposed Wage and Hour Class Action. Discovery and responsive pleading deadline stayed, as of 4/9/21, when the case was deemed complex.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - 2021 04 22 GH POS of Summons - Prime Now LLC.pdf: Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder: Deeming Case Complex - Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline: Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/PML.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies): Comment: Complaint for Damages, Penalties, Restitution and Injunctive Relief

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Lawsuit Notice - Civil Lawsuit Notice: Comment: 1st CMC set for 8/4/21 at 2:30pm D3; assigned to Hon. Patricia M. Lucas for all purposes.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons: Issued/Filed - Summons: Issued/Filed:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet:

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRIME NOW LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of California is a litigant