This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 12/11/2020 at 22:39:32 (UTC).

Able Exterminators, Inc. vs Anne Walker Citraro et al

Case Summary

On 03/16/2020 Able Exterminators, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Anne Walker Citraro. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Mikkelsen, Laurie and Barrett, Thang N. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5742

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Mikkelsen, Laurie

Barrett, Thang N

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Able Exterminators, Inc.

Defendants

S & R Income Fund I, LP

WRP Properties, LLC

Walker Citraro, Anne

Pinto, Stephan P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Penning, James M.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketConference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Barrett, Thang N; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketConference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Mikkelsen, Laurie; Hearing Time: 3:45 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketStatement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketSummons: Issued/Filed - Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketComplaint (Limited): >$10K and <$25K - Comment: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Able Exterminators, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where S & R INCOME FUND I, LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Penning, James M.