This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 12:47:54 (UTC).

Abby Chamali vs Fatima Naaman

Case Summary

On 10/04/2018 Abby Chamali filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Fatima Naaman. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Towery, James E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3875

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Towery, James E

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Chamali, Abby

Respondent

Naaman, Fatima

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2019
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Towery, James E; Judgment Type: Judgment/order (FL); Party: Names: Chamali, Abby; Naaman, Fatima

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Judgment: Notice of Entry (Family)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Judgment: Dissolution/FC2336

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Declaration for default filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Appearance Stipulation & Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Stipulation and Order Appointment of Pro Tem - No Fee - Comment: Sharon L. Roper

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • Acknowledgement/Receipt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • Response: Dissolution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Petition: Dissolution

    Read MoreRead Less