This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/21/2022 at 18:41:30 (UTC).

Abbas v. Hogan, et al. (Align Technology, Inc.)

Case Summary

On 04/12/2019 Abbas filed a Contract - Security lawsuit against Hogan, Align Technology, Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Other - Stayed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6429

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Security

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Muhammad Abbas

Defendants

Align Technology Inc.

Joseph M. Hogan

John F. Morici

Kevin J. Dallas

Joseph Lacob

Charles Raymond Larkin, Jr.

George J. Morrow

Thomas M. Prescott

Andrea L. Saia

Greg J. Santora

Susan E. Siegal

Warren S. Thaler

Raphael S. Pascaud

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Interested Party

Jessica McCall

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Adam M. Apton

Defendant Attorneys

Caz Hashemi

Nicholas Ryan Miller

Ignacio Evaristo Salceda

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

Interested Party Attorney

Steven Ray Wedeking

 

Court Documents

Substitution: Attorney

2/19/2021 Substitution: Attorney

Notice: Change Address/Firm Name

2/10/2020 Notice: Change Address/Firm Name

Proof of Service: Electronic

2/10/2020 Proof of Service: Electronic

Opposition/Objections

2/4/2020 Opposition/Objections

Notice: Related Cases

1/28/2020 Notice: Related Cases

Proof of Service

5/16/2019 Proof of Service

Stipulation and Order

5/16/2019 Stipulation and Order

Proof of Service

5/15/2019 Proof of Service

Order: Deeming Case Complex

5/15/2019 Order: Deeming Case Complex

Civil Lawsuit Notice

4/26/2019 Civil Lawsuit Notice

Proof of Service

4/26/2019 Proof of Service

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

4/12/2019 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Summons: Issued/Filed

4/12/2019 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/12/2019 Civil Case Cover Sheet

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

02/19/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Substitution: Attorney; Filed By: Muhammad Abbas,; Comment: SUBSTITUION OF ATTORNEY CIVIL (Without Court Order)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/10/2020
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Electronic; Filed By: Muhammad Abbas,

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/10/2020
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Notice: Change Address/Firm Name; Filed By: Muhammad Abbas,

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/04/2020
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Opposition/Objections; Filed By: Jessica McCall,; Comment: Jessica McCall's Opposition to Defendant Align Technology, Inc.'s Notice of Related Case

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/28/2020
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Notice: Related Cases; Filed By: Align Technology Inc.,; Comment: Notice of Related Case

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2019
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Stipulation and Order; Comment: Stipulation & Order to Stay the Case - signed/BCW

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2019
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: Muhammad Abbas,; Comment: POS - Order Deeming Case Complex_FINAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/15/2019
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Order: Deeming Case Complex; Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline signed/BCW

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/15/2019
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: Align Technology Inc., Joseph Hogan, John Morici, Kevin Dallas, Joseph Lacob, Charles Larkin, Jr., George Morrow, Thomas Prescott, Andrea Saia, Greg Santora, Susan Siegal, Warren Thaler, Raphael Pascaud,; Comment: Proof of Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2019

DocketDescription: Acknowledgement/Receipt; Filed By: Muhammad Abbas,; Comment: re: GEORGE J. MORROW

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
05/08/2019

DocketDescription: Acknowledgement/Receipt; Filed By: Muhammad Abbas,; Comment: re: JOSEPH M. HOGAN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2019

DocketDescription: Acknowledgement/Receipt; Filed By: Muhammad Abbas,; Comment: re: JOSEPH LACOB

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2019

DocketDescription: Acknowledgement/Receipt; Filed By: Muhammad Abbas,; Comment: re: WARREN S. THALER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2019

DocketDescription: Acknowledgement/Receipt; Filed By: Muhammad Abbas,; Comment: re: JOHN F. MORICI

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2019

DocketDescription: Acknowledgement/Receipt; Filed By: Muhammad Abbas,; Comment: re: GREG J. SANTORA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2019
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: Muhammad Abbas,; Comment: Proof of Service - Civil Lawsuit Notice and ADR Information Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2019
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Civil Lawsuit Notice; Comment: 1st CMC set for 8/2/19 at 10am in D1; assigned to Hon. Brian C. Walsh for all purposes

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2019
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2019
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Muhammad Abbas,

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2019
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Muhammad Abbas,

[+] Read More [-] Read Less