This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 19:51:35 (UTC).

A-United, Inc. vs Jason Levy

Case Summary

On 04/04/2018 A-United, Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jason Levy. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth, Kirwan, Peter and Arand, Mary E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6108

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Kirwan, Peter

Arand, Mary E

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

A-United, Inc.

A-United Financial

Defendants

Levy, Jason Weldon

Jbay

Levy, Jason W

Levy, Jason

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Harris, Wendy Marie

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2019
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Continued: Court's Motion; Comment: *continued from 12/18/18*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: HRG 5/16/2019 - Amended Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Judgment: Default - Comment: ***PENDING***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Default Pending - Comment: HRG 5/16/2019 - Request for Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Declaration - Comment: HRG 5/16/2019 - Amended Declaration of Wendy Harris

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Declaration - Comment: HRG 5/16/2019 - Amended Declaration of Mia Adamson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Brief: Trial - Comment: HRG 5/16/2019 - Amended Trial Brief

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: HRG 5/16/2019 - Amended Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/21/2018
  • Order: Proposed - Comment: ***PENDING***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • Default Pending - Comment: ***PENDING***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • Declaration - Comment: HRG 7/17/18 - Declaration of Wendy M. Harris in Support of Plaintiff's Application for Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • Declaration - Comment: HRG 7/17/18 - Declaration of Mia Adamson in Support of Plaintiff's Application for Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • Summary of Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: against: Jason Levy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • Default Pending - Comment: CRT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less