This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/27/2018 at 17:57:34 (UTC).

A. Sarosiek vs D. Sanders, et al

Case Summary

On 10/04/2005 A Sarosiek filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against D Sanders. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kelly, John. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************2800

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kelly, John

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ana M Sarosiek

Sarosiek, Ana M

Defendants

Denise Sanders

Mark Sanders

Sanders, Mark

Sanders, Denise

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2005
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Sanders, Mark; Party: Name: Sanders, Denise; Party: Name: Sarosiek, Ana M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2005
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Kelly, John; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Sanders, Mark; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=F; Party: Name: Sanders, Denise; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=F; Party: Name: Sarosiek, Ana M; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=A; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Sanders, Mark; Judgment Amount: $200.00; And Attorney Fees: $0.00; Awarded Against: Sarosiek, Ana M; Amount; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Costs: $0.00; Other: $200.00; Total: $200.00; Comment: printdate=Nov 30 2005; origjudgdate=Nov 7 2005; judgstatusdate=Nov 30 2005; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCMN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2005
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Kelly, John; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Sanders, Mark; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Sanders, Denise; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Sarosiek, Ana M; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Non-Monetary Award: Awarded To: Sarosiek, Ana M; Awarded Against: Sanders, Denise; Comment: printdate=Nov 30 2005; freetext=defendents to re-paint shed to brown color it once was within 60 days of judgement.; origjudgdate=Nov 7 2005; judgstatusdate=Nov 30 2005; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCMN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2005
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Sanders, Mark; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Sanders, Denise; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Sarosiek, Ana M; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2005
  • Judgment: Satisfaction - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Acknowledge Satisfaction of Jgmt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2005
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Kelly, John; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard: Judgment; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = JK3 - Kelly, John Result Date = 11/07/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2005
  • Defendant's Claim-$1,500 or Less - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Defendant's Claim/<13,non-Gov

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2005
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2005
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2005
  • Cause Of Action - Action Complaint; File Date: 10/04/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2005
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$1,500 or Less - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff's Claim/<13,non-Gov

    Read MoreRead Less