This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/17/2019 at 04:45:00 (UTC).

A. Rodriguez Vs Walmart/Claims Management Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/23/2015 A Rodriguez filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Walmart/Claims Management Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Yep, Steven L and Steingart, Lisa. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************1881

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Yep, Steven L

Steingart, Lisa

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Alex Rodriguez

Gilroy, CA 95020

Rodriguez, Alex

Defendant

Walmart/Claims Management Inc.

702 Sw 8Th Street

Bentonville, AR 72716

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Request for Dismissal (PR, SC); Party: Names: Rodriguez, Alex; Walmart/Claims Management Inc.; Comment: Plt. dismissed with prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Yep, Steven L; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • Clerk Rejection Letter - Comment: Notice Of Settlement Of Entire Case (Phillip, Spallas & Angstadt): ***View Document Return Form for additional details.***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • Request: Action - Comment: Please reveiw and advise. Defendant has submitted "Notice Of Settlement Of Entire Case." ORDER: Denied. Defendants Judicial Council forms improperly states Judge Kirihara and Dept. 9. Commissioner Yep.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • Certificate of Mailing - Comment: Order on Request to Postpone Trial, mailed to all parties.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • Order: Continuance - Comment: Order on request to postpone trial is granted. Hearing to be held: 2/23/16 1:00 PM D-15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • Request for Continuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • Proof of Service - Comment: Cert Mail Service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2015
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Steingart, Lisa; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Off calendar: no service - reset; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = SS5 - Scott, Stuart Result Date = 11/05/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • Cause Of Action - Action Complaint; File Date: 09/24/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) - Judicial Officer: Yep, Steven L; Comment: Text = GRANTED: Filing papers in Superior court; Giving notice and certificates. Legacy Name = Order on Court Fee Waiver Decision = G Closed = 09/25/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • Request to Waive Court Fees (FW-001) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = Req to Waive Court Fees Decision = M Closed = 09/24/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$5,001 to $10,000 - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim $7501-$10000 Decision = M Closed = 09/24/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WALMART CLAIMS MANAGEMENT INC./AR CLAIMS MANAGEMENT INC. is a litigant