This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/08/2018 at 11:59:46 (UTC).

A. Parrot vs R. Sherbino

Case Summary

On 05/19/2009 A Parrot filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against R Sherbino. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Zepeda, Carrie, Madden, James P and Minkus, Leslie. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************6257

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Zepeda, Carrie

Madden, James P

Minkus, Leslie

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Anais Parrot

E Palo Alto, CA 94303

Parrot, Anais

Defendants

Ryan Sherbino

Mountain View, CA 94041

Sherbino, Ryan

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2010
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Sherbino, Ryan; Party: Name: Parrot, Anais

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2010
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Zepeda, Carrie; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Sherbino, Ryan; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Parrot, Anais; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Parrot, Anais; Judgment Amount: $4,029.88; And Attorney Fees: $0.00; Awarded Against: Sherbino, Ryan; Amount; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Costs: $160.00; Other: $3,869.88; Total: $4029.88; Comment: printdate=Jan 12 2010; freetext=ANAIS PARROTT TO RECOVER FROM RYAN SHERBINO $3,869.88 PLUS $160.00 IN COSTS FOR A TOTAL JUDGMENT OF $4,029.88 - signed by judge zepeda; origjudgdate=Jan 8 2010; judgstatusdate=Jan 12 2010; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCMN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2009
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Sherbino, Ryan; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Parrot, Anais; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Parrot, Anais; Judgment Amount: $7,660.00; And Attorney Fees: $0.00; Awarded Against: Sherbino, Ryan; Amount; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Costs: $160.00; Other: $7,500.00; Total: $7660.00; Comment: printdate=Oct 13 2009; origjudgdate=Oct 8 2009; judgstatusdate=Oct 13 2009; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCMN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2009
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Sherbino, Ryan; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Parrot, Anais; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2010
  • Hearing: Motion hearings - Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2010
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Orders Issued; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = JM - Madden, James Result Date = 04/19/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2010
  • Hearing: Motion hearings - Original Type: Hearing: Motion hearings; Judicial Officer: Minkus, Leslie; Hearing Time: 1:15 PM; Result: Continued: Court; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = LM - Minkus, Leslie Result Date = 04/08/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2010
  • Clerk's Notice - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC-Ntc to Appear in Court Decision = M Closed = 03/12/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2010
  • Order - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = defendent submits request for court order & answer. plaintiff submits their response. case submitted to commissioner james madden. per commissioner madden to set court date. all notfied by mail. Legacy Name = SC Order of Court Decision = M Closed = 03/12/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2010
  • Request: Court Order (Small Claims) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = on 3/10/10 plaintiff submits answer;case submitted to commissioner james madden Legacy Name = SC Req:Court Order & Answer Decision = M Closed = 03/10/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/08/2010
  • Judgment - Judicial Officer: Zepeda, Carrie; Comment: Text = ANAIS PARROTT TO RECOVER FROM RYAN SHERBINO $3,869.88 PLUS $160.00 IN COSTS FOR A TOTAL JUDGMENT OF $4,029.88 - signed by judge zepeda Legacy Name = CV Judgment Decision = G Closed = 01/12/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2009
  • Clerk's Notice - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SCA-Ntc of SC Appeal Trial Decision = M Closed = 10/29/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2009
  • Notice: Appeal (Small Claims) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Ntc of Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2009
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Heard: Default Judgment; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = JM - Madden, James Result Date = 10/08/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2009
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Continued: Court; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = JM - Madden, James Result Date = 09/03/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2009
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2009
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Off calendar: no service - reset; Comment: Result By = P Result Date = 07/27/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2009
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Vacated; reset; Comment: Result By = P Result Judge = JM - Madden, James Result Date = 06/17/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2009
  • Cause Of Action - Action Complaint; File Date: 05/19/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2009
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$5,001 to $10,000 - Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim $5001-$7500 Decision = M Closed = 09/04/2009

    Read MoreRead Less