This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/20/2018 at 09:11:45 (UTC).

A. Olbrich, et al vs The Denardi Group, et al

Case Summary

On 11/18/2014 A Olbrich filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against The Denardi Group. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth and Arand, Mary E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************3421

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Arand, Mary E

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Aaron Olbrich

Christal Olbrich

California Dreaming Lp

Olbrich, Christal

Olbrich 2012 Revocable Trust Trust

Olbrich, Aaron

Defendants

The Denardi Group

Kevin Denardi

Intero Real Estate Services, Inc.

Jose "Joe" Velasco

Velasco, Jose "Joe"

Denardi, Kevin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Von R Reyes

152 North Third Street, Suite 700

San Jose, CA 95112-5560

Reyes, Von Ryan

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Name: Denardi, Kevin; Party: Name: The Denardi Group; Party: Name: California Dreaming LP; Party: Name: Olbrich, Christal; Party: Name: Olbrich, Aaron

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Name: Velasco, Jose "Joe"; Party: Name: Intero Real Estate Services, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • Hearing: Dismissal after settlement - Original Type: Hearing: Dismissal after settlement; Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Vacated; dismissal filed; Comment: Text = Cont from 9-24-15 *Counsel to file a Dismissal* Result By = C Result Judge = MEA - Arand, Mary Result Date = 10/07/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Entry of Dismissal w/POS Decision = M Closed = 11/14/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • Request: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: Text = Atty Nathaniel Lucey Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Entire w/Prej Decision = M Closed = 10/07/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • Hearing: Dismissal after settlement - Original Type: Hearing: Dismissal after settlement; Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard: Continued (Event); Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = MEA - Arand, Mary Result Date = 09/24/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2015
  • Conference: Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Case Management; Judicial Officer: Strickland, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Vacated: settled; Comment: Result By = K Result Judge = ES7 - Strickland, Elizabeth Result Date = 03/17/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: Text = re (Atty V. Reyes) Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Entry of Dismissal w/POS Decision = M Closed = 03/26/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2015
  • Notice: Settlement - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: Text = CONDITIONAL filed by Atty Von Reyes. Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Settlement Decision = M Closed = 03/17/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2015
  • Request: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: Text = Atty Von Ryan Reyes Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial Decision = M Closed = 03/17/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2015
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Decision = M Closed = 02/05/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2015
  • Complaint: Amended - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: Text = atty Reyes Legacy Name = CV 1st Amended Complaint Decision = M Closed = 01/26/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2014
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 12/19/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2014
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 12/19/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2014
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 12/02/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2014
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 11/24/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2014
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 11/18/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2014
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued Decision = M Closed = 11/18/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 11/18/2014

    Read MoreRead Less