This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/02/2022 at 09:07:51 (UTC).

A. Martinez vs ROEM Development Corporation, et al

Case Summary

On 11/06/2013 A Martinez filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ROEM Development Corporation. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Overton, Carol, Zayner, Theodore C, Folan, Maureen A, Strickland, Elizabeth and Huber, Joseph H.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************5688

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Overton, Carol

Zayner, Theodore C

Folan, Maureen A

Strickland, Elizabeth

Huber, Joseph H.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Arthur Martinez

Martinez, Arthur

Defendants

Roem Development Corporation

Roem Builders Incorporated

1ST & Rosemary Senior

Cross Plaintiff

Express Fence, LLC

Cross Defendant

Terradan Construction, Inc.

Intervenor

Interstate Fire And Casualty Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael A. Horowitz

675 North First Street, Suite 100

San Jose, CA 95112

Michael Alan Horowitz

Steven J. Brewer

Brewer, Steven J.

Horowitz, Michael A.

Defendant Attorneys

Shuey, David T

David Todd Shuey

 

Court Documents

Conference: Trial Setting

6/13/2017 Conference: Trial Setting

Conference: Trial Setting

6/13/2017 Conference: Trial Setting

Conference: Trial Setting

6/13/2017 Conference: Trial Setting

Conference: Trial Setting

6/13/2017 Conference: Trial Setting

Conference: Trial Setting

6/13/2017 Conference: Trial Setting

Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

11/2/2017 Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

11/2/2017 Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

11/2/2017 Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

11/2/2017 Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

11/2/2017 Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS

11/6/2017 Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS

Minute Order

11/2/2017 Minute Order

Minute Order

9/14/2017 Minute Order

Minute Order

6/14/2017 Minute Order

Minute Order

5/9/2017 Minute Order

Minute Order

5/9/2017 Minute Order

Minute Order

4/4/2017 Minute Order

Minute Order

4/4/2017 Minute Order

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS; Filed By: Jennifer Thomas, Express Fence, LLC,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: Dismissal after settlement; Department: Department 6; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Continued: Court's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS; Filed By: ROEM Development Corporation, ROEM Builders Incorporated, 1st & Rosemary Senior,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • DocketDescription: Clerk Rejection Letter; Filed By: ROEM Development Corporation, ROEM Builders Incorporated, 1st & Rosemary Senior,; Comment: Request for dismissal for cross complaint action - cross complainants does not match with court record.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketDescription: Clerk Rejection Letter; Filed By: Arthur Martinez,; Comment: RE: Request for Dismissal - Cannot dismiss entire action with cross-complaints on file that have not been dismissed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Motion: Summary Judgment/Adjudication; Department: Department 6; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Off Calendar (before hearing)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Settlement; Filed By: Arthur Martinez,; Comment: (atty: Horowitz)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • DocketDescription: Answer: Cross Complaint; Filed By: Express Fence, LLC,; Comment: Express Fence, LLC's Answer to First Amended Cross-Complaint of Roem Development Corporation, Roem Builders Incorporated, and 1st & Rosemary Senior Atty Thomas

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
148 More Docket Entries
  • 04/03/2014
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Arthur Martinez, ROEM Development Corporation, ROEM Builders Incorporated,; Comment: Text = atty McElroy Legacy Name = CV Answer, Unltd, w/fees Decision = M Closed = 04/03/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2014
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 5; Time: 3:45PM; Result: Set for: further CMC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2014
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Arthur Martinez,; Comment: Text = atty horowitz Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement Decision = M Closed = 02/24/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2014
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Arthur Martinez, 1st & Rosemary Senior,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 01/22/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2014
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Arthur Martinez, ROEM Builders Incorporated,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 01/22/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2014
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Arthur Martinez, ROEM Development Corporation,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 01/22/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2013
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2013
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Arthur Martinez, ROEM Development Corporation, ROEM Builders Incorporated, 1st & Rosemary Senior,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 11/06/2013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2013
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Arthur Martinez, ROEM Development Corporation, ROEM Builders Incorporated, 1st & Rosemary Senior,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued Decision = M Closed = 11/06/2013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2013
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Arthur Martinez, ROEM Development Corporation, ROEM Builders Incorporated, 1st & Rosemary Senior,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 11/06/2013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Roem Development Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where 1st and Rosemary Family Housing LP is a litigant

Latest cases where Roem Builders, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHUEY, DAVID T