This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/16/2019 at 08:00:17 (UTC).

A. Low vs N. Battel

Case Summary

On 01/21/2015 A Low filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against N Battel. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Folan, Maureen A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************5814

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Folan, Maureen A

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Edward Jones

Aileen Low

Jones, Edward

Petitioner

Low, Aileen

Defendants

Benetech, Inc.

Nancy M Battel

Respondent

Battel, Nancy M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

Samuel Keesal

450 Pacific Avenue

San Francisco, CA 94133-4626

Keesal, Samuel

Kole, Julie A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Arbitration Award (CV); Party: Name: Benetech, Inc.; Party: Name: Battel, Nancy M; Party: Name: Low, Aileen; Party: Name: Jones, Edward

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Judgment Type: Arbitration Award (CV); Party: Name: Benetech, Inc.; Comment: dispositiveflag=NO;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Battel, Nancy M; Comment: dispositiveflag=NO;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Low, Aileen; Comment: dispositiveflag=NO;foragainstcode=F; Party: Name: Jones, Edward; Comment: dispositiveflag=NO;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Non-Monetary Award: Awarded To: Low, Aileen; Awarded Against: Battel, Nancy M; Comment: printdate=Mar 30 2015; freetext=Judgment shall be and is entered in favor of Petitioners and the Award rendered in the Arbitration is confirmed in its entirety - signed by Judge Folan *see judgment for details*; possessionflag=0; printpartiesflag=1; origjudgdate=Mar 30 2015; judgstatusdate=Mar 30 2015; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=11UN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2015
  • Miscellaneous: Converted Document - Comment: Edward Jones and Nancy M. Battel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2015
  • Judgment - Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Comment: Text = Judgment shall be and is entered in favor of Petitioners and the Award rendered in the Arbitration is confirmed in its entirety - signed by Judge Folan *see judgment for details* Legacy Name = CV Judgment Decision = M Closed = 03/30/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • Clerk Rejection Letter - Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Comment: Text = There is no proof that the proposed judgment was served on opposing party. Legacy Name = CV Clerk Rejection Ltr Decision = M Closed = 03/18/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2015
  • Hearing: Confirm Arbitration Award - Original Type: Hearing: Confirm Arbitration Award; Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Heard: Granted; Comment: Text = and Enter Judgment by Plts Edward Jones and Aileen Low (Julie A. Kole) Result By = C Result Judge = MAF - Folan, Maureen Result Date = 03/17/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2015
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Decision = M Closed = 03/17/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2015
  • Order After Hearing - POS - Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Comment: Text = Motion to Confirm FINRA Arbitration Award is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Folan Legacy Name = CV Ord After Hearing Decision = G Closed = 03/17/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2015
  • Response/Reply - Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Comment: Text = Reply in support of petition to confirm arbitration award, 3/17/15 9am D-8, by atty Porter. Legacy Name = CV Reply Decision = M Closed = 03/10/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2015
  • Proof of Service: Personal - Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Personal Svc Decision = M Closed = 02/02/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2015
  • Acknowledgement - Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Acknowledge Receipt Decision = M Closed = 02/02/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2015
  • Declaration: In Support - Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Comment: Text = of Jennifer M. Porter Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support Decision = M Closed = 01/22/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2015
  • Memorandum: Points and Authorities - Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Memo:Ps & As/Suppt of Mtn Decision = M Closed = 01/22/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2015
  • Court Reporter Per Diem Fees - Half Day - Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Court Reporter Fee < 1 Hour Decision = M Closed = 01/22/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2015
  • Motion: Other - Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Comment: Text = Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award 3/17/15 @ 9am Dept 8 atty Kole Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Motion w/fee Decision = M Closed = 01/22/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2015
  • Motion: Confirm Arbitration Award - Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Petn:Confirm Arbitration Award Decision = M Closed = 01/21/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 01/21/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KEESAL SAMUEL AARON JR