This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/19/2019 at 20:53:45 (UTC).

A-L Financial Corp. vs T. Fitzhugh

Case Summary

On 05/07/2010 A-L Financial Corp filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against T Fitzhugh. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Mackin McCarthy, Kristine, Naim, Tahir and Elfving, William J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************9613

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Mackin McCarthy, Kristine

Naim, Tahir

Elfving, William J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A-L Financial Corp.

P.O. Box 11907

Santa Ana, CA 92711-1907

Defendants

Tyrone Fitzhugh

Hayward, CA 94544

Fitzhugh, Tyrone

Assignee

Pacific Credit Exchange

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2010
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Party: Name: Fitzhugh, Tyrone; Party: Name: A-L Financial Corp.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2010
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Naim, Tahir; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Party: Name: Fitzhugh, Tyrone; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: A-L Financial Corp.; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: A-L Financial Corp.; Judgment Amount: $2,585.00; And Attorney Fees: $0.00; Awarded Against: Fitzhugh, Tyrone; Amount; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Costs: $85.00; Other: $2,500.00; Total: $2585.00; Comment: clerkid=275; printdate=Jul 23 2010; origjudgdate=Jul 15 2010; judgstatusdate=Jul 23 2010; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCMN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2010
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Party: Name: Fitzhugh, Tyrone; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: A-L Financial Corp.; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • Proof of Service: Mail - Comment: assignment of judgment / appointment of attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • Substitution: Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • Judgment: Assignment - Comment: Assignee: Pacific Credit Exchange

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • Minute Order - Comment: Minutes Non-Criminal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • Hearing: Order of Examination - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • Application for order for judgment debtor exam

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2014
  • Warrant: Returned and Filed - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = BW returned/filed w/ affidavit of unsuccessful service and decl. of diligence Legacy Name = SC Bench Warrant Returned & Filed Decision = M Closed = 06/17/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2012
  • Warrant: Issued - Judicial Officer: Mackin McCarthy, Kristine; Comment: Text = BW for Tyrone Fitzhugh and $50 check to Santa Clara County Sheriff's Dept. Legacy Name = SC Bench Warrant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2012
  • Hearing: Order of Examination - Original Type: Hearing: Order of Examination; Judicial Officer: Mackin McCarthy, Kristine; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Bench warrant order issued; Comment: Text = Bench Warrant issued for Tyrone Fitzhugh. Bail set at $3,000.00. Result By = C Result Judge = KMM - McCarthy, Kristine Result Date = 12/10/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2012
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Decl:Authority to Represent Decision = M Closed = 12/10/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2012
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = POS on OEX. Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2012
  • Application: Order of Examination - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Appl/Ord:Appearance/Exam

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2010
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Heard: Default Judgment; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = TN2 - Naim, Tahir Result Date = 07/15/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2010
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Decl:Authority to Represent Decision = M Closed = 07/15/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2010
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = by substituted service Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2010
  • Cause Of Action - Action Complaint; File Date: 05/10/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2010
  • Plaintiff's Claim-More than 12 - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim/13 or more claims Decision = M Closed = 05/10/2010

    Read MoreRead Less