This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 16:58:45 (UTC).

A-L Financial Corp. vs R. Duffy

Case Summary

On 01/26/2011 A-L Financial Corp filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against R Duffy. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Elfving, William J, Madden, James P and Lee, Jeffrey. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************7775

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Elfving, William J

Madden, James P

Lee, Jeffrey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A-L Financial Corp.

Po Box 11907

Santa Ana, CA 92711-1907

Defendants

Ricky M Duffy

Palo Alto, CA 94303

Duffy, Ricky M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2011
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Party: Name: Duffy, Ricky M; Party: Name: A-L Financial Corp.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2011
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lee, Jeffrey; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Party: Name: Duffy, Ricky M; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: A-L Financial Corp.; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: A-L Financial Corp.; Judgment Amount: $858.49; And Attorney Fees: $0.00; Awarded Against: Duffy, Ricky M; Amount; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Costs: $100.00; Other: $758.49; Total: $858.49; Comment: printdate=Mar 8 2011; origjudgdate=Mar 8 2011; judgstatusdate=Mar 8 2011; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCMN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2011
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Party: Name: Duffy, Ricky M; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: A-L Financial Corp.; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • Writ: Execution (Filed) - Comment: Unsatisfied; deficit $1828.81; issued 8/03/15; Los Angeles.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • Judgment: Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • Writ: Execution (Issued) - Comment: AGAINST: Ricky M. Duffy Santa Clara $2,063.89

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • Memorandum of Costs - Comment: COST: $455.00: INTEREST: $725.40: DATE: 08/03/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • Affidavit - Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF UNSUCCESSFUL SERVICE: Civil Warrant.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • Warrant: Returned and Filed - Comment: Return unserved.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • Warrant: Issued - Comment: BW for Ricky M Duffy & $50.00 check to San Jose Sheriff's Dept

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 04/05/2012
  • Writ: Execution (Issued) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Writ of Exec

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2012
  • Memorandum of Costs - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = Costs $140.00; interest $101.61; DOM 3/05/12. Legacy Name = SC Memo of Costs/after Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2011
  • Warrant: Returned and Filed - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Bench Warrant Returned & Filed Decision = M Closed = 12/07/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2011
  • Hearing: Order of Examination - Original Type: Hearing: Order of Examination; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 1:45 PM; Result: Bench warrant order issued; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = JM - Madden, James Result Date = 09/29/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2011
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2011
  • Application: Order of Examination - Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Appl/Ord:Appearance/Exam Closed = 09/30/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2011
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Lee, Jeffrey; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard: Judgment; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = JL3 - Lee, Jeffrey Result Date = 03/08/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2011
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2011
  • Cause Of Action - Action Complaint; File Date: 01/26/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2011
  • Plaintiff's Claim-More than 12 - Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim/13 or more claims Decision = M Closed = 03/08/2011

    Read MoreRead Less