This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 04/05/2022 at 02:11:23 (UTC).

A-L Financial Corp. vs M. Velazquez, et al

Case Summary

On 11/05/2010 A-L Financial Corp filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against M Velazquez. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Colistra, J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************1977

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Colistra, J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A-L Financial Corp.

Defendants

Maria Luz Velazquez

Charles A. Thomas

Velazquez, Maria Luz

Thomas, Charles A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2013
  • DocketDescription: Judgment: Satisfaction; Filed By: A-L Financial Corp.,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Acknowledge Satisfaction of Jgmt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2012
  • DocketDescription: Writ: Execution (Filed); Filed By: A-L Financial Corp., Maria Velazquez,; Comment: Text = los angeles, $ 249.31 deficit, issued 3/29/11 Legacy Name = SC Writ of Exec/Rtn Partially Satis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2011
  • DocketDescription: Writ: Execution (Issued); Filed By: A-L Financial Corp.,; Comment: Text = Los Angeles, $2,569.52 Legacy Name = SC Writ of Exec

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2011
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Default; Filed By: A-L Financial Corp.,; Comment: Text = Granted Legacy Name = SC Decl:Default in Payments on Jgmt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2011
  • DocketDescription: Memorandum of Costs; Filed By: A-L Financial Corp.,; Comment: Text = Interest $44.52 Legacy Name = SC Memo of Costs/after Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2011
  • HearingDescription: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Department: Department 58; Time: 1:00PM; Result: Heard: Stipulated judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2011
  • DocketDescription: Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party; Filed By: A-L Financial Corp.,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Decl:Authority to Represent Decision = M Closed = 01/14/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2010
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: Maria Velazquez,; Comment: Text = Sub service Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2010
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Mail; Filed By: Maria Velazquez,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc by Mail Decision = M Closed = 11/16/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2010
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: Charles Thomas,; Comment: Text = Substitute service Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2010
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Mail; Filed By: Charles Thomas,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc by Mail Decision = M Closed = 11/16/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2010
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2010
  • DocketDescription: Plaintiff's Claim-More than 12; Filed By: A-L Financial Corp.,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim/13 or more claims Decision = M Closed = 11/05/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A-L FINANCIAL CORP is a litigant