This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/25/2019 at 12:52:43 (UTC).

A-L Financial Corp. vs D. Witt

Case Summary

On 03/10/2014 A-L Financial Corp filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against D Witt. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Saldivar, Gregory H, Steingart, Lisa, Elfving, William J and Copeland, Christine. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************5051

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Saldivar, Gregory H

Steingart, Lisa

Elfving, William J

Copeland, Christine

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A-L Financial Corp.

Po Box 11907

Santa Ana, CA 92711-1907

Defendants

Daniel C. Witt

Hollister, CA 95023

Witt, Daniel C.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2014
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Party: Name: Witt, Daniel C.; Party: Name: A-L Financial Corp.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2014
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Steingart, Lisa; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Party: Name: Witt, Daniel C.; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: A-L Financial Corp.; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: A-L Financial Corp.; Judgment Amount: $2,310.56; And Attorney Fees: $0.00; Awarded Against: Witt, Daniel C.; Amount; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Costs: $85.00; Other: $2,225.56; Total: $2310.56; Comment: clerkid=355; printdate=Oct 21 2014; freetext=Promissory not/contract/check dated 12-13-11 cancelled by jgmt; possessionflag=0; printpartiesflag=1; origjudgdate=Oct 15 2014; judgstatusdate=Oct 21 2014; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCMN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2014
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Party: Name: Witt, Daniel C.; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: A-L Financial Corp.; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • Hearing: Order of Examination - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: At 2/22/16 OEX hearing; The Parties agree that Defendant Daniel Witt pay $80.00 per month to the Plaintiff begining on 02-26-16 and $80.00 is Due on the 26th of each month thereafter, until the judgment is paid in full. Bench Warrant OEX hearing orignally scheduled by Sheriff department for 02-15-16; Court closed holiday. Clerk's office rescheduled to 02-22-16.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • Minute Order - Comment: Minutes Non-Criminal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • Proof of Service: Personal - Comment: POS on Civil Bench Warrant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • Warrant: Returned and Filed - Comment: BW for Daniel C. Written Promise hearing set for 02-15-16 am Dept 03.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • Warrant: Issued - Comment: BW issued & $ 50.00 ck sent to Sheriff's Dept. (San Benito Co.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2015
  • Hearing: Order of Examination - Original Type: Hearing: Order of Examination; Judicial Officer: Copeland, Christine; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Bench warrant order issued; Comment: Text = BW issued for Daniel C Witt , bail set at $ 2,500.00 Result By = C Result Judge = CC2 - Copeland, Christine Result Date = 06/01/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2015
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Decl:Authority to Represent Decision = M Closed = 07/08/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2015
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = POS on OEX. Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • Application: Order of Examination - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = OEX signed and service copy mailed back to creditor 4/15/15 in SASE Legacy Name = SC Appl/Ord:Appearance/Exam

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2014
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Steingart, Lisa; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Heard: Default Judgment; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = LS - Steingart, Lisa Result Date = 10/15/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2014
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Saldivar, Gregory H; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued: Court; Comment: Text = Hearing at Morgan Hill rescheduled to San Jose; Morgan Hill Small Claims Court closure effective 10/06/14. Result By = C Result Judge = GHS - Saldivar, Gregory Result Date = 09/17/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2014
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Decl:Authority to Represent Decision = M Closed = 10/16/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2014
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Saldivar, Gregory H; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued: Court; Comment: Text = deft will be making payments, parties request continuance Result By = C Result Judge = GHS - Saldivar, Gregory Result Date = 04/16/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2014
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = Betty Porrata Legacy Name = SC Decl:Authority to Represent Decision = M Closed = 04/17/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2014
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = subserved Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2014
  • Cause Of Action - Action Complaint; File Date: 03/10/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2014
  • Plaintiff's Claim-More than 12 - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim/13 or more claims Decision = M Closed = 03/10/2014

    Read MoreRead Less