This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/16/2022 at 15:20:23 (UTC).

A-L Financial Corp. Inc Vs D. Volle

Case Summary

On 12/12/2008 A-L Financial Corp Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against D Volle. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************1976

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A-L Financial Corp

Defendant

Debra J. Volle

Assignee

Pacific Credit Exchange

 

Court Documents

Application: Renewal Judgment

1/17/2019 Application: Renewal Judgment

Memorandum of Costs

1/17/2019 Memorandum of Costs

Proof of Service: Mail

2/22/2019 Proof of Service: Mail

Notice: Renewal of Judgment

2/22/2019 Notice: Renewal of Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Renewal of Judgment; Filed By: Debra Volle, Pacific Credit Exchange,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Mail; Filed By: Debra Volle, Pacific Credit Exchange,; Comment: POS on: Notice of Renewal of Judgment; Application For And Renewal Of Judgment.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Memorandum of Costs; Filed By: Debra Volle, Pacific Credit Exchange,; Comment: Interest: $2527.70; Mailing: 1/10/19.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Application: Renewal Judgment; Filed By: Pacific Credit Exchange,; Comment: Renewal Judgment Amount: $5142.70.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Renewal of Judgment Issued; Filed By: Debra Volle, Pacific Credit Exchange,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2013
  • DocketDescription: Judgment: Assignment; Filed By: Debra Volle, Pacific Credit Exchange,; Comment: Text = Judg't assigned to Pacific Credit Exchange. Legacy Name = SC Assignment of Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2013
  • DocketDescription: Document: Other; Filed By: Pacific Credit Exchange,; Comment: Text = Appointment of Attorney. Legacy Name = SC Misc Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2013
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Mail; Filed By: Debra Volle, Pacific Credit Exchange,; Comment: Text = POS on: Assignment of Judgment; Appointment of Attorney. Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc by Mail Decision = M Closed = 07/25/2013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2012
  • DocketDescription: Writ: Execution (Filed); Comment: Text = santa clara 06/25/09 Legacy Name = SC Writ of Exec/Rtn Unsatis

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2009
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: Order of Examination; Department: Department 57; Time: 8:30AM; Result: Bench warrant order issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2009
  • DocketDescription: Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party; Filed By: A-L Financial Corp,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Decl:Authority to Represent Decision = M Closed = 11/02/2009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2009
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: A-L Financial Corp,; Comment: Text = OEX Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2009
  • DocketDescription: Application: Order of Examination; Filed By: A-L Financial Corp,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Appl/Ord:Appearance/Exam

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2009
  • DocketDescription: Writ: Execution (Issued); Filed By: A-L Financial Corp, Debra Volle,; Comment: Text = for $2,684.03 to Santa Clara County Legacy Name = SC Writ of Exec

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2009
  • DocketDescription: Memorandum of Costs; Filed By: A-L Financial Corp, Debra Volle,; Comment: Text = Costs: $0.00; Credits: $0.00; Accrued Interest: $84.03 // proof of service by mail on 6/17/09 Legacy Name = SC Memo of Costs/after Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2009
  • HearingDescription: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Department: Department 58; Time: 1:00PM; Result: Heard: Default Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2009
  • DocketDescription: Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party; Filed By: A-L Financial Corp,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Decl:Authority to Represent Decision = M Closed = 02/26/2009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2008
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: A-L Financial Corp, Debra Volle,; Comment: Text = by substituted service Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2008
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2008
  • DocketDescription: Plaintiff's Claim-More than 12; Filed By: A-L Financial Corp,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim/13 or more claims Decision = M Closed = 12/12/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PACIFIC CREDIT EXCHANGE A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where A-L FINANCIAL CORP is a litigant