This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/28/2018 at 15:17:36 (UTC).

A-L Finacial Corp. Vs D. Charles

Case Summary

On 03/06/2006 A-L Finacial Corp filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against D Charles. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Madden, James P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************3274

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Madden, James P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A-L Financial Corp.

4880 Stevens Creek Blvd, #204

San Jose, CA 95129

Defendants

Darryl O Charles

San Francisco, CA 94110

Charles, Darryl O

Assignee

Pacific Credit Exchange

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2006
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Party: Name: Charles, Darryl O; Party: Name: A-L Financial Corp.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2006
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Party: Name: Charles, Darryl O; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: A-L Financial Corp.; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: A-L Financial Corp.; Judgment Amount: $2,655.00; And Attorney Fees: $0.00; Awarded Against: Charles, Darryl O; Amount; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Costs: $155.00; Other: $2,500.00; Total: $2655.00; Comment: printdate=May 12 2006; origjudgdate=May 11 2006; judgstatusdate=May 12 2006; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCMN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2006
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Party: Name: Charles, Darryl O; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: A-L Financial Corp.; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • Notice: Renewal of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • Proof of Service: Mail - Comment: POS on Notice of Renewal of Judg't; Application For And Renewal Of Judgment.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • Application: Renewal Judgment - Comment: Against: Darryl Charles - $5,311.63

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • Memorandum of Costs - Comment: INTEREST: $2,626.63; DATE: 04-01-16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2010
  • Abstract of Judgment: Issued - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Abstract of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2010
  • Document: Other - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = appointment of attorney filed Legacy Name = SC Misc Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2010
  • Judgment: Assignment - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Assignment of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2006
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Heard: Default Judgment; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = JM - Madden, James Result Date = 05/11/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2006
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2006
  • Cause Of Action - Action Complaint; File Date: 03/06/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2006
  • Plaintiff's Claim-More than 12 - Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim/13 or more claims Decision = M Closed = 05/12/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PACIFIC CREDIT EXCHANGE A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where A-L FINANCIAL CORP is a litigant