This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/25/2019 at 12:48:54 (UTC).

A. Jehning, Et Al Vs T. Triano, Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/10/2014 A Jehning filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against T Triano. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Zayner, Theodore C, Elfving, William J, Stoelker, James L, Strickland, Elizabeth and Huber, Joseph H.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************1863

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Zayner, Theodore C

Elfving, William J

Stoelker, James L

Strickland, Elizabeth

Huber, Joseph H.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Albert Jehning

Audrey Jehning

Jehning, Audrey

Jehning, Albert

Defendants

Tina Anne Triano

Jeffrey Allen Mentzos

Ted Triano

Miller Triano

Mentzos, A.P.C.

Triano, Tina Anne

Mentzos, Jeffrey Allen

American Home Buyers Alliance

Triano, Ted

Miller, Triano And Mentzos, A.P.C.

Estate Of Tina Anne Triano

Mentzos, Jeffrey Alan

National Trust Institute

Special Administrator Of The Estate Of Tina Anne Triano

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

McAllister, Marlis

Defendant Attorneys

Jacks, Bradley W.

Mentzos, Jeffrey A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Judgment Type: Dismissal - After Other ADR (CV); Party: Names: Jehning, Albert; Jehning, Audrey; Triano, Tina Anne; Mentzos, Jeffrey Allen; Mentzos, Jeffrey Allen; Triano, Ted; Miller, Triano And Mentzos, A.P.C.; Estate Of Tina Anne Triano; Mentzos, Jeffrey Alan; Comment: entire w/prej (Marlis McAllister)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • Jury Trial: Long Cause - Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Est. 5 Days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • Conference: Settlement - Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • Conference: Trial Setting - Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Set per 1/26/16 11am Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • Minute Order - Comment: Minutes Non-Criminal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • Minute Order - Comment: Minutes Non-Criminal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • Conference: Trial Setting - Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • Substitution: Attorney - Comment: old: Pardue new: pro per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • Conference: Trial Setting - Original Type: Conference: Trial Setting; Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Heard: Continued (Event); Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = TZ - Zayner, Theodore Result Date = 10/07/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 08/08/2014
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Decision = M Closed = 08/08/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2014
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Comment: Text = W. Pardue Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement Decision = M Closed = 08/08/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2014
  • Proof of Service: Mail - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Comment: Text = General denial. Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc/Regular Mail Decision = M Closed = 07/29/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2014
  • General Denial: Unlimited - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Comment: Text = Atty Pardue. Legacy Name = CV General Denial, Unltd Decision = M Closed = 07/29/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2014
  • Conference: Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Case Management; Judicial Officer: Strickland, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 2:15 PM; Result: Set for: further CMC; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = ES2 - Strickland, Elizabeth Result Date = 07/15/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2014
  • Affidavit: Proof of Publication - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Publication Decision = M Closed = 07/03/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2014
  • Request: Order for Service by Posting/Publication - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Comment: Text = order for publication of summons, memorandum of points and authorities, declaration of Marlis McAllister. GRANTED by Judge Elfving Legacy Name = CV Request for ord for serv by posting Decision = M Closed = 05/22/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2014
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 03/10/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2014
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued Decision = M Closed = 03/10/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 03/10/2014

    Read MoreRead Less