This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/25/2019 at 08:58:28 (UTC).

A. Haole, et al vs P. Pries, et al

Case Summary

On 01/30/2014 A Haole filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against P Pries. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Overton, Carol, Stoelker, James L, Folan, Maureen A, Strickland, Elizabeth and Huber, Joseph H.. The case status is Other - Stayed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************9827

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2014

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Overton, Carol

Stoelker, James L

Folan, Maureen A

Strickland, Elizabeth

Huber, Joseph H.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Eric Gray

Nicole Gray

Salvador Herrera

Dennis Prasad

Manjula Singh

Alondra Haole

Phillip Robinson

Jenna Lee Stevens

Carol Stevens

Daniel Poston

Santokh Singh

Cora Melendez

Sean Melendez

Edgar Melendez

Jesus Figueroa

Lizeth Leon

Elisa Mora

Giovanni Mora

Ana Hernandez

Armando Hernandez

22 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kenneth M Greenstein

300 Montgomery Street, Suite 621

San Francisco, CA 94104-1908

Other Attorneys

Greenstein, Kenneth M

Boer, Gina D.

Torsney, Patrick J.

Montalvo, Jose A.

Daniel, Craig C

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • Hearing: Dismissal after settlement - Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Not Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: PARTIAL complaint w/prej as to Xuereb's only (atty: Kenneth Greenstein)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: PARTIAL complaint w/prej as to Koula and Paul Pries ONLY (atty: Kenneth Greentstein)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: PARTIAL complaint w/prej as to Interstate, IEC and Village ONLY (atty: Kenneth Greentstein)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • Jury Trial: Long Cause - Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: est. 20 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • Conference: Settlement Jury - Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • Notice: Change Address/Firm Name

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Dismissal - Comment: partial with prejudice by atty Boer as to Agate SC Investment LLC only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: Partial w/ Prejudice as to Cross-Complaint Against Agate SC Investment LLC Only (Gina Dashman Boer)

    Read MoreRead Less
83 More Docket Entries
  • 06/02/2014
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Comment: Text = atty Boer Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement Decision = M Closed = 06/02/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2014
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Comment: Text = atty Boer Legacy Name = CV Answer, Unltd, w/fees Decision = M Closed = 06/02/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2014
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Comment: Text = Atty Kenneth Greenstein Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement Decision = M Closed = 05/19/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2014
  • Jury Fee Deposit - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Jury Fee Deposit Decision = M Closed = 04/01/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2014
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Comment: Text = Atty Torsney Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement Decision = M Closed = 04/01/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2014
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Comment: Text = Atty Torsney Legacy Name = CV Answer, Unltd, w/fees Decision = M Closed = 04/01/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2014
  • Jury Fee Deposit - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Comment: Text = $150 deposited Legacy Name = CV Jury Fee Deposit Decision = M Closed = 01/30/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2014
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 01/30/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2014
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued Decision = M Closed = 01/30/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 01/30/2014

    Read MoreRead Less