This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/22/2022 at 21:09:31 (UTC).

A & E Solutions, Inc. vs Shaycore Enterprises, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/21/2021 A E Solutions, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Shaycore Enterprises, Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8849

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A & E Solutions, Inc.

Defendants

Shaycore Enterprises, Inc., a Florida Corporation

Merlin Entertainments Group Florida, LLC, a Florida limited liability Company

Milpitas Mills Limited Partnership, a Delaware limited partnership

Shaycore Enterprises, Inc.

Merlin Entertainments Group Florida, LLC

Merlin Entertainments Group U.S. Holdings, Inc.

Cross Defendant

LegoLand Discovery Center San Jose LLC

Not Yet Classified

Milpitas Mills Limited Partnership

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Emily Z Manninger

JoLynn M. Scharrer

Defendant Attorney

Andrew John Haley

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Joseph J. Kagan

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

12/3/2021 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

12/3/2021 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Summons: Issued/Filed

9/21/2021 Summons: Issued/Filed

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

12/3/2021 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/21/2021 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

9/21/2021 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Clerk Rejection Letter

2/17/2022 Clerk Rejection Letter

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

2/1/2022 Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)

2/1/2022 Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)

Statement: Case Management Conference

2/1/2022 Statement: Case Management Conference

Notice

1/31/2022 Notice

Proof of Service

1/31/2022 Proof of Service

Statement: Case Management Conference

1/31/2022 Statement: Case Management Conference

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

1/31/2022 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Statement: Case Management Conference

1/31/2022 Statement: Case Management Conference

Errata

12/20/2021 Errata

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

12/15/2021 Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Notice: Lis Pendens

12/14/2021 Notice: Lis Pendens

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Clerk Rejection Letter; Filed By: LegoLand Discovery Center San Jose LLC,; Comment: ENV#8223911 / Answer: $435.00 first paper fee required

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 19; Time: 3:45PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Merlin Entertainments Group U.S. Holdings, Inc.,; Comment: to Complaint, by Atty. Haley

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable); Filed By: Merlin Entertainments Group Florida, LLC, LegoLand Discovery Center San Jose LLC, Merlin Entertainments Group U.S. Holdings, Inc.,; Comment: $150 Jury fee paid for defendants and cross-defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Merlin Entertainments Group Florida, LLC, LegoLand Discovery Center San Jose LLC, Merlin Entertainments Group U.S. Holdings, Inc.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Filed By: A & E Solutions, Inc.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: A & E Solutions, Inc.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: A & E Solutions, Inc.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: A & E Solutions, Inc.,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint - Merlin Entertainments Group Florida

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer/Response (No Fee); Comment: to Complaint. Atty Kagan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Cross-Complaint; Comment: of Milpitas Mills. Atty Kagan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Comment: to XC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Clerk Rejection Letter; Filed By: Merlin Entertainments Group Florida, LLC,; Comment: Documents do not comply with California Rule of Court, Rule 2.100-2.119: State Bar Number required.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint: Amendment To (New Party); Filed By: A & E Solutions, Inc.,; Comment: naming Doe 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: A & E Solutions, Inc.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: A & E Solutions, Inc.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: A & E Solutions, Inc.,

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MERLIN ENTERTAINMENTS GROUP FLORIDA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Merlin Entertainments Group US Holding Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where MILPITALS MILLS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP is a litigant