Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/08/2018 at 07:56:27 (UTC).

A. Chew vs H. Magallanes

Case Summary

On 04/22/2009 A Chew filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against H Magallanes. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Saldivar, Gregory H, Steingart, Lisa and Yep, Steven L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************4069

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Saldivar, Gregory H

Steingart, Lisa

Yep, Steven L

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Andrew Chew

Sunnyvale, CA 94086

Chew, Andrew

Defendants

Hermelinda Zepeda Magallanes

San Jose, CA 95116

Magallanes, Hermelinda Zepeda

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2009
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Party: Name: Magallanes, Hermelinda Zepeda; Party: Name: Chew, Andrew

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2009
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Yep, Steven L; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Party: Name: Magallanes, Hermelinda Zepeda; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Chew, Andrew; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Chew, Andrew; Judgment Amount: $7,575.00; And Attorney Fees: $0.00; Awarded Against: Magallanes, Hermelinda Zepeda; Amount; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Costs: $75.00; Other: $7,500.00; Total: $7575.00; Comment: clerkid=321; printdate=Aug 24 2009; freetext=Defendant shall pay Plaintiff on Plaintiffs claim. This Judgment results from a motor vehicle accident on a California Highway and was caused by the judgment debtor's operation of a motor vehicle. If the judgment is not paid, the judgment c; origjudgdate=Aug 17 2009; judgstatusdate=Aug 24 2009; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCPD;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2009
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Party: Name: Magallanes, Hermelinda Zepeda; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Chew, Andrew; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2010
  • Hearing: Order of Examination - Original Type: Hearing: Order of Examination; Judicial Officer: Steingart, Lisa; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard: Debtor Sworn; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = CC2 - Copeland, Christine Result Date = 07/26/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2010
  • Document: Other - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = Notice of Stay of Proceedings Legacy Name = SC Misc Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2010
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = served BW by personal service Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2010
  • Warrant: Issued - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = BW for Hermelinda Zepeda Magallanes WP $ 7,700.00 hearing date set for 7/26/10 Legacy Name = SC Bench Warrant/Ord of Exam

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2010
  • Warrant: Issued - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = BW for Hermelinda Zepeda Magallanes & $50.00 check to Sherrif's Dept. Legacy Name = SC Bench Warrant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2010
  • Hearing: Order of Examination - Original Type: Hearing: Order of Examination; Judicial Officer: Steingart, Lisa; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Bench warrant order issued; Comment: Text = BW-Hermalinda Zepeda Magallanes-$7,700, cash bail self/cash bail w/authorization to apply Result By = C Result Judge = SLY - Yep, Steven Result Date = 02/01/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2009
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = personal service; pos on OEX Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2009
  • Application: Order of Examination - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Appl/Ord:Produce Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2009
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Saldivar, Gregory H; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Heard: Default Judgment; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = SLY - Yep, Steven Result Date = 08/17/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2009
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued: Court; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = CPT - Tem, Pro Result Date = 06/29/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2009
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = Amended POS Sub service Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2009
  • Defendant's Claim (Amended) (No change in claim amount) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = changed def address Legacy Name = SC Amended Claim (no fee) Decision = M Closed = 06/01/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2009
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = sub-service Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2009
  • Cause Of Action - Action Complaint; File Date: 04/22/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2009
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$5,001 to $10,000 - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = claim maount $7500.00 Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim $5001-$7500 Decision = M Closed = 06/29/2009

    Read MoreRead Less