This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/14/2022 at 12:38:34 (UTC).

A. Chavez, et al vs La Primera Nutricion, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/10/2012 A Chavez, filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against La Primera Nutricion, Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************8485

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Abraham Osiris Chavez

Javier Pino Flores

Rene Esqueda

Osvaldo Cortez Robles

Defendant

La Primera Nutricion, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Scott Spini

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2012
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 9; Time: 1:30PM; Result: Vacated; dismissal filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2012
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: Abraham Chavez, Javier Flores, Rene Esqueda, Osvaldo Robles, La Primera Nutricion, Inc.,; Comment: Text = Filed by Atty David Spini Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Entire w/Prej Decision = M Closed = 06/19/2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2012
  • DocketDescription: Complaint: Amended; Filed By: Abraham Chavez, Javier Flores, Rene Esqueda, Osvaldo Robles, La Primera Nutricion, Inc.,; Comment: Text = re 1st Amdd Complaint (Atty D. Spini) Legacy Name = CV 1st Amended Complaint Decision = M Closed = 03/29/2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2012
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2012
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Abraham Chavez, Javier Flores, Rene Esqueda, Osvaldo Robles, La Primera Nutricion, Inc.,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 02/10/2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2012
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Abraham Chavez, Javier Flores, Rene Esqueda, Osvaldo Robles, La Primera Nutricion, Inc.,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued Decision = M Closed = 02/10/2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2012
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Abraham Chavez, Javier Flores, Rene Esqueda, Osvaldo Robles, La Primera Nutricion, Inc.,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 02/10/2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LA PRIMERA NUTRICION, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Spini, David S.