This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/22/2019 at 08:48:15 (UTC).

A. Bate vs Game Set Match LLC

Case Summary

On 12/20/2011 A Bate filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Game Set Match LLC. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Healy, Nicole, Poppe, Matthew and Madden, James P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************8501

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Healy, Nicole

Poppe, Matthew

Madden, James P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bate, Andrew

Defendants

Game Set Match LLC

Walton, Linda

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2012
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Walton, Linda; Party: Name: Game Set Match LLC; Party: Name: Bate, Andrew

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2012
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Game Set Match LLC; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Bate, Andrew; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Bate, Andrew; Judgment Amount: $4,772.50; And Attorney Fees: $0.00; Awarded Against: Game Set Match LLC; Amount; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Costs: $97.50; Other: $4,675.00; Total: $4772.50; Comment: printdate=Feb 29 2012; origjudgdate=Feb 27 2012; judgstatusdate=Feb 29 2012; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCMN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2011
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Game Set Match LLC; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Bate, Andrew; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2013
  • Hearing: Order of Examination - Judicial Officer: Poppe, Matthew; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2012
  • Hearing: Order of Examination - Original Type: Hearing: Order of Examination; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 1:15 PM; Result: Bench warrant order issued; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = JM - Madden, James Result Date = 08/02/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2012
  • Writ: Execution (Issued) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Writ of Exec

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2012
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2012
  • Memorandum of Costs - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Memo of Costs/after Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Hearing: Order of Examination - Original Type: Hearing: Order of Examination; Judicial Officer: Healy, Nicole; Hearing Time: 1:15 PM; Result: Continued: Court; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = NH2 - Healy, Nicole Result Date = 06/28/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Declaration - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = Declaration of Due Diligence submitted by judment creditor. Legacy Name = SC Misc Declaration Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2012
  • Application: Order of Examination - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Appl/Ord:Produce Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2012
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard: Judgment; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = JM - Madden, James Result Date = 02/27/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2012
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued: Court; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = JM - Madden, James Result Date = 01/30/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2012
  • Request: Postponement (Small Claims) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Req:Continuance/After Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2012
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2011
  • Cause Of Action - Action Complaint; File Date: 12/20/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2011
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$1,501 to $5,000 - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim $1501-$5000 Decision = M Closed = 12/20/2011

    Read MoreRead Less