This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/23/2022 at 02:36:41 (UTC).

3 Cool Cats, LLC et al vs Early Growth Financial Services, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/29/2021 3 Cool Cats, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Early Growth Financial Services, Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0555

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

3 Cool Cats, LLC

Defendant

Early Growth Financial Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeffrey Edwards Faucette

Defendant Attorneys

Ernest Michael Malaspina

Elaisha Nandrajog

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/29/2021 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

10/29/2021 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Summons: Issued/Filed

10/29/2021 Summons: Issued/Filed

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

12/7/2021 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

12/29/2021 Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2022
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 20; Time: 3:00PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Early Growth Financial Services, Inc.,; Comment: to complaint, Atty Nandrajog

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: 3 Cool Cats, LLC,; Comment: Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: 3 Cool Cats, LLC,; Comment: No Civil Lawsuit Notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: 3 Cool Cats, LLC,; Comment: Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: 3 Cool Cats, LLC,; Comment: Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less