This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 19:49:41 (UTC).

27 WPI Old Warm Springs, LLC vs Semi-Pac, Inc

Case Summary

On 04/04/2018 27 WPI Old Warm Springs, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Semi-Pac, Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth and Arand, Mary E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6064

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Arand, Mary E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

27 WPI Old Warm Springs, LLC

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Semi-Pac, Inc

Semi-Pac, Inc.

Cross Defendants

Schonenberg, MGR. WPI, Michael

Hoang, CEO AiPac, Tri

AiPac, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sweet, Rodney M.

Rehon, Peter Michael

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Loyer, Kathleen Muraco

Tichinin, Bruce

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2019
  • Reserved - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Mtn. to Amend Answers by Def. (Bruce Tichinin 408-429-8415) TT 07/07/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • Reserved - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Mtn. to File Cross-Complaint by Def. (Bruce Tichinin 408-429-8415) TT 07/07/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • Conference: Trial Setting - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Conference: Trial Setting - Original Type: Conference: Trial Setting; Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Stipulation and Order - Comment: Signed by Judge Arand

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Proof of Service - Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 05/15/2018
  • Default Pending - Comment: ***PENDING***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Semi-Pac Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • Default Pending - Comment: CRT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • Default Pending - Comment: CRT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • Proof of Service: Mail - Comment: Proof of Service: Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • Request: Judicial Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • General Denial: Unlimited - Comment: General Denial - First Appearance. atty: Loyer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less