This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/17/2022 at 12:10:57 (UTC).

111 W. ST.JOHN LLC vs CINTA AVEDA INSTITUTE, INC.

Case Summary

On 01/03/2022 111 W ST JOHN LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against CINTA AVEDA INSTITUTE, INC. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2984

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

111 W. ST.JOHN LLC

Defendant

CINTA AVEDA INSTITUTE, INC.

Not Classified By Court

All Unnamed Occupants

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Todd B. Rothbard

Defendant Attorney

Parsa Kafi

 

Court Documents

UD Masking Letter

1/5/2022 UD Masking Letter

UD Masking Letter

1/5/2022 UD Masking Letter

UD Masking Letter

1/5/2022 UD Masking Letter

UD Masking Letter

1/5/2022 UD Masking Letter

Plt Mand Cover Sheet -Supp Alleg

1/3/2022 Plt Mand Cover Sheet -Supp Alleg

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/3/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons: Issued/Filed

1/3/2022 Summons: Issued/Filed

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

1/3/2022 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Proof of Service: Mail

1/18/2022 Proof of Service: Mail

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

1/18/2022 Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Memorandum: At Issue

1/28/2022 Memorandum: At Issue

Minute Order

2/16/2022 Minute Order

Trial: Unlawful Detainer

2/16/2022 Trial: Unlawful Detainer

Trial: Unlawful Detainer

2/16/2022 Trial: Unlawful Detainer

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2022
  • HearingDescription: Trial: Unlawful Detainer; Department: Department 4; Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Trial: Unlawful Detainer; Department: Department 4; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Memorandum: At Issue; Filed By: 111 W. ST.JOHN LLC,; Comment: request to set case for trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: CINTA AVEDA INSTITUTE, INC.,; Comment: To Plaintiff's Complaint, Attorney Kafi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Mail; Filed By: CINTA AVEDA INSTITUTE, INC.,; Comment: For Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: UD Masking Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: UD Masking Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: UD Masking Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: UD Masking Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Plt Mand Cover Sheet -Supp Alleg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CINTA AVEDA INSTITUTE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Parsa Kafi