This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/11/2022 at 21:24:54 (UTC).

Timed Out, LLC v. Discus Dental et al.

Case Summary

On 02/13/2013 Timed Out, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Discus Dental. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Johnson, Jane. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7134

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Johnson, Jane

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Timed Out, LLC

Respondents and Defendants

Bonifacio & Reyes, DDS

Charles Nicholson DDS

Kiumars Rahimi

Jeffrey R. Sholer

Rudolph M. Soto

Armon Eben

Shatha Mechael

Thomas Davies DDS

Nilesh Pema

Michael J. Chen DDS, INC.

Robert Moretta

Sally Hsu

Helen IM, DDS, A Professional Corp.

Van Dang, DDS, A Professional Dental Corporation

Thomas Wong DDS

Sam Muslin D.D.S., M.A.G.D., Inc.

Ronald Abaro

Nick Levi, DDS, A Professional Corp.

Other

Hon. Jane Johnson (Coordination Trial Judge-JCCP No. 4683)

63 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

Timothy A. Hall

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Brian Y. Fujita

Michael John MacLellan

Jennifer Ann Scher

Kent Michael Walker

Michael Thomas Lane

Jacob Kadavil George

Wesley Joseph Hammond

Robert P. Andris

Denise Thompson

William C. Haggerty

Other Attorneys

Jeffrey Jay Lederman

James C. Potepan

Krista Marie Enns

Peter E. Perkowski

Craig Crockett

Gregory Lee Rovenger

Russell K. Ryan

Erin Rose Ranahan

David Spencer Bloch

1 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2013
  • DispositionDescription: Abandonment of appeal filed in trial court; Disposition Type: Final As to all appellants and appeals

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2013
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2013
  • DocketDescription: Abandonment of appeal filed in trial court.; Notes: AS TO ALL APPEALS--NOTICE FILED 9-16-13 WITH L.A. SUPERIOR COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2013
  • DocketDescription: Received document entitled:; Notes: Conformed copy of the Notice of abandonment of appeals submitted to L.A. Superior Court on 7-16-13

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2013
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: Notice of Settlement by atty Hall for aplt.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2013
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: It is hereby ordered that appeal Nos. B242820 and B247134 shall be scheduled for oral argument on the same day. The parties in Timed Out v. Discus Dental, LLC et al. shall file their briefs in accordance with California Rules of Court, rule 8.212. PK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2013
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: By Attorney for Appellant, Timed Out, LLC to respondents' MOTION FOR AN ORDER (1) ASSIGNING THIS CASE TO DIVISION 3; AND (2) SCHEDULING ORAL ARGUMENT ON THE SAME DAY AS TIMED OUT, LLC v. YOUABIAN, ET AL., CASE NO. B242820

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2013
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO ASSIGN THIS CASE TO DIVISION 3 WITH TIMED OUT, LLC v. YOUABIAN, ET AL., CASE NO. B242820. The decision as to consolidation, extensions of time, etc., is left to the discretion of the Presiding Justice of Division Three. (APJ)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2013
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Attorneys for Appellee Discus Dental, LLC Plaintiff/Cross-Defendant in: Discus Dental v. Timed Out, No. BC458806 Intervenor in: Timed Out v. Reintjes, No. 11-CECG02092 Timed Out v. Hakimi, No. 56-2011-00398818 Timed Out v. Moretta, No. 30-2011-00492589-CU-PO-CJC Timed Out v. Mechael, No. 37-2011-00068362-CU-NP-EC Timed Out v. Baik, No. 111CV205505Check # 11913

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2013
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: The time within which to file Appellant's Designation of Record and Civil Case Information Statement is hereby extended to July 1, 2013. No further extensions will be granted. Upon the filing of Appellant's Civil Case Information Statement, Appellant is hereby ordered to file only ONE Civil Case Information Statement in the above-entitled matter, including a copy of the judgment or order being appealed, pursuant to Rule 8.100(g) of the California Rules of Court. Appellant's designation of record shall be filed directly in the Civil Appeals Unit of the Los Angeles Superior Court at 111 N. Hill Street, Room 111A, Los Angeles, California 90012.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
261 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2013
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed 02/13/2013 (Timed Out, LLC v. Chelsea Chin- Judgment 11/16/2012)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2013
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed 02/13/2013 (Timed Out, LLC v. Michael J. Chen DDS, Inc. - Judgment 11/16/2012)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2013
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed 02/13/2013 (Timed Out, LLC v. Roger Chang DDS and Thomas Wong DDS-Judgment 11/16/2013)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2013
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed 02/13/2013 (Timed Out, LLC v. Bonifacio & Reyes, DDS-Judgment 11/16/12)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2013
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed 02/13/2013 (Timed Out, LLC v. Bruce Baumann- Judgment 11/16/2012)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2013
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed 02/13/2013 (Timed Out, LLC v. Keyvan Bamshad, DDS., Inc. -Judgment 11/16/2012)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2013
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed 02/13/2013 (Timed Out, LLC v. Dennis Baik/ Judgment December 14, 2012)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2013
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed 02/13/2013 (Timed Out, LLC v. Arteaga, DDS/Judgment 11/16/2012)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2013
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed 02/13/2013 (Timed Out, LLC v. Abaro et al/Judgment 11/16/2012)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2012
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Alameda County Superior Court - Main; County: Alameda; Trial Court Case Number: RG12628391; Trial Court Name: Alameda County Superior Court - Main; County: Alameda; Trial Court Case Number: HG12623753; Trial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: SC116520; Trial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: LC097093; Trial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BC483744; Trial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: SC115642; Trial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BC479299; Trial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: EC056706; Trial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BC468805; Trial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: EC058350; Trial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: JCCP4683; Trial Court Judge: Johnson, Jane

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less