This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/26/2020 at 01:07:36 (UTC).

Spanos v. Dreyer, Babich, Buccola & Callaham, LLP, et al.

Case Summary

On 08/15/2014 Spanos filed an Other lawsuit against Dreyer, Babich, Buccola Callaham, LLP,. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Third Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cadei, Raymond. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7235

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Cadei, Raymond

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Angela Spanos

Defendant and Respondent

Dreyer, Babich, Buccola & Callaham, LLP et al.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Kevin Michael Sullivan

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

Mark E. Ellis

 

Court Documents

C077235

Court of Appeal Opinion

 

Docket Entries

08/29/2016

DocketDescription: Case complete.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2016

DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.; Notes: Spanos shall pay Dreyer's costs on appeal.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2016

DispositionDescription: Affirmed in full; Disposition Type: Final; Publication Status: Signed Unpublished; Author: Duarte, Elena J.; Participants: Renner, Jonathan K. (Concur) Robie, Ronald B. (Concur)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2016

DocketDescription: Opinion filed.; Notes: (Signed Unpublished) The judgment is affirmed. Spanos shall pay Dreyer's costs on appeal.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/20/2016

DocketDescription: Cause argued and submitted.; Notes: Andrew Steinheimer argued for Def-Resp. No appearance for Plt-Appt.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/20/2016

DocketDescription: Argument order sent.; Notes: Monday, June 20, 2016, at 2:00 p.m. Raye, P.J. Tentative Panel: Robie, Duarte, Renner (Subject to change without notice)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2016

DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: By Respondent.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/07/2016

DocketDescription: Oral argument waiver notice sent.; Notes: Request due: 04/18/2016

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/11/2016

DocketDescription: Augmentation granted. (See order.); Notes: Respondents' as to the material attached.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2016

DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
22 More Docket Entries
10/27/2014

DocketDescription: Respondent's mediation statement filed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2014

DocketDescription: Appellant's mediation statement filed.; Notes: Respondent's due 10/30/14.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/15/2014

DocketDescription: Order waiving filing fee.; Notes: Raye, P.J.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/15/2014

DocketDescription: Application for waiver of filing fee filed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2014

DocketDescription: Mail returned and re-sent.; Notes: Appellant's copy of court's letters dated 09/02/14 marked refused. Verified information and remailed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/02/2014

DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: Fee waiver or request to waive fee due: 09/17/14

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/02/2014

DocketDescription: Respondent notified re CAMS.; Notes: Due 10 days after appellants' CAMS.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/02/2014

DocketDescription: Letter to counsel - 10 days to file case information statement.; Notes: and CAMS due: 09/12/14

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2014

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed in the trial court on 08/15/14. Legal Malpractice

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2014

DocketTrial Court Name: Sacramento County Superior Court; County: Sacramento; Trial Court Case Number: 34201300137950CUPNGDS; Trial Court Judge: Cadei, Raymond

[+] Read More [-] Read Less