This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/21/2022 at 14:18:35 (UTC).

Nelson v. American Apparel, Inc. et al.

Case Summary

On 02/14/2008 Nelson filed an Other lawsuit against American Apparel, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Shook, John. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5937

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Shook, John

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Mary Nelson

Appellants and Defendants

American Apparel, Inc.

Martin Bailey

Dov Charney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Keith A. Fink

Attorney at Fink & Associates

11500 Olympic Blvd. Suite 316

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Carlos Yguico

Attorney at Gemmill,Thornton & Baldridge LLP

5670 Wilshire Blvd Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90036

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Adam Levin

Attorney at Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp

11377 W Olympic Blvd

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Taylor Stephen Ball

Attorney at Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp

11377 W Olympic Blvd

Los Angeles, CA 90064-1683

Joycelyn Estacio Crucillo

747 Warehouse Street

Los Angeles, CA 90021

Wendy Cole Lascher

Attorney at Lascher & Lascher

Po Box 25540 605 Poli St

Ventura, CA 93002

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2009
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2009
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2009
  • DocketDescription: Record returned from Supreme Court.; Notes: 1x6"

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2009
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied in Supreme Court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2009
  • DocketDescription: Service copy of petition for review received.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2008
  • DocketDescription: Record transmitted to Supreme Court.; Notes: 1x6"

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2008
  • DocketDescription: Service copy of petition for review received.; Notes: Mary Nelson

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2008
  • DispositionDescription: Reversed in Full; Disposition Type: Final Reversed; (14 pages); Publication Status: Signed Unpublished; Author: Turner, Paul; Participants: Kriegler, Sandy R. (Concur) Armstrong, Orville A. (Concur)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2008
  • DocketDescription: Opinion filed.; Notes: (Signed Unpublished) Reversed; (14 pages)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2008
  • DocketDescription: Original entry stricken - sequence no. not removed.; Notes: entry re order on request for oral argument

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 04/07/2008
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: American Apparel, Inc.Attorney: Adam Levin Attorney: Joycelyn Estacio Crucillo Attorney: Taylor Stephen Ball Defendant and Appellant: Dov CharneyAttorney: Joycelyn Estacio Crucillo Attorney: Taylor Stephen Ball Defendant and Appellant: Martin BaileyAttorney: Joycelyn Estacio Crucillo Attorney: Taylor Stephen Ball

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2008
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Wendy Cole Lascher associates in for Aplnt American Apparel, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2008
  • DocketDescription: Record imaged.; Notes: To IKON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2008
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: r-3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2008
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Ntc of desig filed 2/25/08 SCLA: no proceedings reported on 1/23/08 as designated - per SCLA ntc dtd 3/12/08

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2008
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2008
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Adam Levin re: stipulation to briefing order in prev. case B205888; unconformed copy of ntc of designation attached; filed in by D. Nolan on 2/25/08.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2008
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: n/a 2/14/08 American Apparel, Inc., Dov Charney & Martin Bailey

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2008
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: Briefing order. Appeal entitled to preference (CCP 1291.2). The aob is due 15 days from the date of the filing of the record. The 8.220(a)(1) notice shall issue 16 days from the date the record is filed. The rb is due 15 days from the filing of the aob. The 8.220(a)(2) notice shall issue 16 days from the date the aob is filed. The reply brief is due 10 days from the filing of the rb. This shall constitute the 8.220 notices.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2008
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BC333028; Trial Court Judge: Shook, John

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN APPAREL (USA) LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YGUICO, CARLOS V

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FINK KEITH A. ESQ.