This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 11/07/2023 at 06:05:38 (UTC).

Zirpel v. ALKI David Productions Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/29/2021 Zirpel filed an Other lawsuit against ALKI David Productions Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Landin, Dennis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7334

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Landin, Dennis

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Karl Zirpel

Appellant and Defendant

ALKI David Productions Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Jennifer A. Lipski

Nicholas W. Sarris

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Elizabeth G. Chilton

Fred D. Heather

 

Court Documents

B317334

Court of Appeal Opinion

 

Docket Entries

09/21/2023

DocketDescription: Case complete.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023

DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023

DocketDescription: Order granting publication filed.; Notes: THE COURT:* The opinion in the above entitled matter filed on June 20, 2023, was not certified for publication in the Official Reports. Good cause appearing, it is ordered that the opinion in the above entitled matter be published in the official reports. Panel: *CURREY, P. J., COLLINS, J. and ZUKIN, J.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2023

DocketDescription: Filed request to publish opinion.; Notes: Filed by the California Labor Comissioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2023

DocketDescription: Petition for rehearing denied.; Notes: THE COURT:* Appellant's petition for rehearing, filed July 5, 2023, is denied. Panel: *CURREY, Acting P.J., COLLINS , J. and ZUKIN, J.** **Judge of the Los Angeles County Superior Court, assigned by the Chief Justice pursuant to article VI, section 6 of the California Constitution.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2023

DocketDescription: Filed change of firm name.; Notes: appellant's counsel changed to: Glaser, Weil, Fink, Howard, Jordan & Shapiro LLP

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023

DocketDescription: Rehearing petition filed.; Notes: filed by appellants

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/20/2023

DispositionDescription: Affirmed in full; Disposition Type: Final; Publication Status: Signed Published; Author: Zukin, Helen; Participants: Collins, Audrey B. (Concur) Currey, Brian S. (Concur)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/20/2023

DocketDescription: Opinion filed.; Notes: (Signed Unpublished)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2023

DocketDescription: Cause argued and submitted.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
09/07/2022

DocketDescription: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: ALKI David Productions Inc. Attorney: Fred D. Heather Appellant's appendix and opening brief 5 volumes; 3064 pages

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2022

DocketBrief: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: ALKI David Productions Inc.Attorney: Fred D. Heather; Notes: Appellant's appendix and opening brief 5 volumes; 3064 pages

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2022

DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:; Notes: AOB/RBF +30

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2022

DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-6

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2022

DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated Jan. 10, 2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2022

DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: ALKI David Productions Inc. Attorney: Fred D. Heather

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2022

DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: ALKI David Productions Inc.Attorney: Fred D. Heather

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/18/2022

DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check #398553 for $775

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/04/2022

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed on December 29, 2021 by ALKI David Productions Inc.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/08/2021

DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BC684618; Trial Court Judge: Landin, Dennis

[+] Read More [-] Read Less