This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/22/2022 at 01:55:08 (UTC).

Zhou v. Stewart Title Guaranty Company et al.

Case Summary

On 05/24/2021 Zhou filed an Other lawsuit against Stewart Title Guaranty Company. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Broadbelt, Robert. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3152

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Broadbelt, Robert

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Yong Zhou

Defendants and Respondents

Stewart Title Guaranty Company

SJO Investments, LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Arthur Grebow

Attorney at Grebow & Rubin LLP

16133 Ventura Blvd Suite# 700

Encino, CA 91436

Julie H. Rubin

Attorney at Grebow & Rubin LLP

16133 Ventura Blvd. Suite 700

Encino, CA 91436

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Stephen Yoonkyu Ma

Attorney at Early Sullivan Wright Gizer & McRae LLP

6420 Wilshire Blvd 17Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90048

Eric Peter Early

Attorney at Early Sullivan Wright Gizer & McRae

6420 Wilshire Blvd. 17Th Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90048

Jon Alan Enochs

Attorney at Law Office of Jon Alan Enochs

7777 Alvarado Rd Suite 624

La Mesa, CA 91942

Baber Ali Khan

6420 Wilshire Blvd. 17Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90048

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2022
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's reply brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: $390 responsive fee$390 responsive filing fee paid by SJO Investments, LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: SJO Investments, LLC. Attorney: Jon Alan Enochs One extension granted for a total of 30 days:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities or persons filed by:; Notes: Respondent's certificate of interested persons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's reply brief.; Due Date: 02/03/2022; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Yong ZhouAttorney: Arthur Grebow Attorney: Julie H. Rubin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Respondent: SJO Investments, LLC.Attorney: Jon Alan Enochs; Notes: One extension granted for a total of 30 days:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Counsel for Stewart Title Guaranty Company re: they are not a party to this appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Respondent notified re failure to file respondent's brief.; Notes: an RBF was due (by Stewart Title Guaranty Co.) by 12/15/21;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check Number: 394456 for $775

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Yong Zhou Attorney: Arthur Grebow

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Yong ZhouAttorney: Arthur Grebow

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Proceeding by 8.124 - no reporter's transcript.; Notes: notice dated June 2, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee rcvd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: May 24, 2021: Yong Zhou

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BC687779; Trial Court Judge: Broadbelt, Robert

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SJO INVESTMENTS LLC A CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases where Stewart Titile Guaranty Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KHAN BABER ALI

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MA STEPHEN