This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/29/2023 at 21:04:49 (UTC).

ZF Friedrichshafen AG v. The Superior Court of Alameda County

Case Summary

On 11/30/2022 ZF Friedrichshafen AG filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court of Alameda County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 4 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee, Jo-Lynne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6664

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Lee, Jo-Lynne

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ZF Friedrichshafen AG

Respondent

The Superior Court of Alameda County

Interested Parties and Others

Blanca Hernandez

Raul F. Hernandez

Israel Hernandez

Raquel Stackhouse

New United Motor Manufacturing, Inc.

Toyota Motor North America, Inc.

Others

Aisin Corporation

Aisin Holdings of America, Inc.

Akenobo Brake Corporation

Akenobo Brake Industry Co., LTD

Automotive Exchange Service, Inc.

EPE, Inc.

Honeywell International, Inc.

Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc.

Toyota Motor Manufacturing Kentucky, Inc.

Toyota Motor North America, Inc.

Toyota Motor Sales, USA, Inc.

TMD Friction Holdings GMBH

Volkswagen AG

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Carrie Lin

Attorney at MG&M THE LAW FIRM

101 Montgomery St. Suite 2850

San Francisco, CA 94104

Jessica L Ellsworth

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US LLP

555 Thirteenth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20004-1109

Brhan Ali-Hamud Ahmed

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US LLP

1999 Avenue Of The Stars Ste 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Interested Party and Other Attorneys

Joseph D. Satterley

Attorney at Kazan, McClain, Satterley & Greenwood

55 Harrison Street, Suite 400

Oakland, CA 94607

Frank Dennis Pond

Attorney at Pond North LLP

355 South Grand Avenue, 43Rd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3418

Lisa Lurline Oberg

Attorney at Husch Blackwell LLP

1999 Harrison St., Suite 700

Oakland, CA 94612

James G. Scadden

Attorney at Gordon & Rees LLP

275 Battery Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Dean A. Olson

Attorney at Clark Hill LLP

1055 W 7Th St 24Th Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90017-2503

Deborah Ann Smith

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith

333 Bush St, Ste 1100

San Francisco, CA 94104-2875

Edward E. Hartley

Attorney at WFBM, LLP,

255 California St, Ste 525

San Francisco, CA 94111-4928

Viiu Spangler Khare

Attorney at Berkes Crane et al LLP

515 S Figueroa St #1500

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3332

David Raymond Ongaro

Attorney at Ongaro PC

1604 Union Street

San Francisco, CA 94123

Alexander G. Calfo

Attorney at King & Spalding

633 West 5Th Street - Suite 1600

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Christopher Sydney Marks

Attorney at Tanenbaum Keale LLP

701 Pike St, Ste 1575

Seattle, WA 98101-3931

Other Attorneys

Craig Lindsey Hodgson

Attorney at Schnader Harrison Segal & Lewis LLP

650 California St 19Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94108

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: Service copy of petition for review received.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final THE COURT*: The motion to augment the record filed by petitioner on December 19, 2022, is granted. The petition for writ of mandate, prohibition, or other appropriate relief is denied. * Pollak, P.J., Brown, J., and Goldman, J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: THE COURT*: The motion to augment the record filed by petitioner on December 19, 2022, is granted. The petition for writ of mandate, prohibition, or other appropriate relief is denied. * Pollak, P.J., Brown, J., and Goldman, J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: For motion to augment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Motion/application to augment record filed.; Notes: Motion to Augment Record on Appeal; Memorandum of Points and Authorities, by petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Pro hac vice granted; Notes: The application of attorney Jessica L. Ellsworth, District of Columbia Bar Number 484170, of the law firm Hogan Lovells US LLP, to appear as counsel pro hac vice for petitioner ZF Friedrichshafen AG is granted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: For pro hac vice application

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Pro hac vice application; Notes: Motion for Order Granting Application of Jessica L. Ellsworth to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Verified Application of Jessica L. Ellsworth; Declaration of Carrie S. Lin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: on Alameda County Superior Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: paid through Truefiling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Note: Superior Court not listed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Includes Request for Judicial Notice filed in Superior Court and other documents

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: VOLUME 3 of 3, pp. PA562 ? PA609

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: VOLUME 2 of 3, pp. PA289 ? PA561

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: VOLUME 1 of 3, pp. PA001 ? PA288

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities or persons filed by:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate, Prohibition or Other Appropriate Relief (After Denial of Motion to Quash Service of Summons and Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction on November 8, 2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Alameda County Superior Court - Main; County: Alameda; Trial Court Case Number: RG21102984; Trial Court Judge: Lee, Jo-Lynne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EPE, INC. is a litigant