This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/22/2022 at 19:10:56 (UTC).

Zenith Insurance Company v. Hettinga Transportation, Inc. et al.

Case Summary

On 04/13/2022 Zenith Insurance Company filed an Other lawsuit against Hettinga Transportation, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fifth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mathias, David. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4214

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Mathias, David

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

Zenith Insurance Company

Ricardo Gonzalez

Hortencia Gonzalez

Respondents and Defendants

Hettinga Transportation, Inc.

Ricardo Gonzalez

Hortencia Gonzalez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey James Williams

Attorney at Chernow and Lieb

21255 Califa St

Woodland Hills, CA 91367-5005

Philip C. Bourdette

Attorney at Bourdette & Partners

2924 West Main Street

Visalia, CA 93291-5731

Stephen C. Ball

Attorney at Ball, Bonholtzer & Evans

300 North Lake Ave., Suite 1000

Pasadena, CA 91101

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

William M. Woolman

Attorney at Sagaser, Watkins & Wieland PC

5260 N. Palm Ave., Suite 400

Fresno, CA 93704

Kimberly Suzanne Oberrecht

Attorney at Horton, Oberrecht & Kirkpatrick

101 W Broadway Ste 600

San Diego, CA 92101-8296

Brian Hickman

Attorney at Gordon & Polscer LLC

9020 Sw Washington Sq Rd Ste 560

Tigard, OR 97223

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorneys

Philip C. Bourdette

Attorney at Bourdette & Partners

2924 West Main Street

Visalia, CA 93291-5731

Stephen C. Ball

Attorney at Ball, Bonholtzer & Evans

300 North Lake Ave., Suite 1000

Pasadena, CA 91101

William M. Woolman

Attorney at Sagaser, Watkins & Wieland PC

5260 N. Palm Ave., Suite 400

Fresno, CA 93704

Kimberly Suzanne Oberrecht

Attorney at Horton, Oberrecht & Kirkpatrick

101 W Broadway Ste 600

San Diego, CA 92101-8296

Brian Hickman

Attorney at Gordon & Polscer LLC

9020 Sw Washington Sq Rd Ste 560

Tigard, OR 97223

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: 6/9/22; ctrr Grant: 3/17/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: pro hac vice granted; Notes: Good cause appearing, the application for admission pro hac vice of attorney Brian C. Hickman, filed herein on May 12, 2022, is granted for the limited purpose of representing respondent Hettinga Transportation, Inc. in the above entitled action. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 9.40.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: Pro Hac Vice filed on 5/12/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: 5/13/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: the parties and Superior Court notifying that the case has not been selected for this court's mediation program (Local Rules, rule 2(c)). Suspension of record preparation pursuant to local rule 2 is lifted and California Rules of Court, rules 8.121, 8.124 and 8.216, are reinstated as of the date of this letter; Civil Case Information statement remains due 15 days after the superior court sends notification.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: pro hac vice application; Notes: Atty Woolman obo Resp; submits app for Pro Hace Vice for admission of Brian C Hickmanhold 15 days for possible opposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Atty Oberrecht obo Resp Hettinga Transp.; associates Atty Woolman

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Atty Williams obo Applt Zenith Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: Dear Counsel: It has come to this court's attention that we have not received the following: [X] The Civil Information Statement as required by rule 8.100(g) of California Rules of Court has not been filed. If a perfected Case Information Statement is not filed within 15 days of the date of this notice, the court may impose monetary sanctions or dismiss the appeal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's Questionnaire received.; Notes: Atty Oberrecht obo Respondent Hettinga Transportation, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: $775.00 check # 466748

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's Questionnaire received.; Notes: Atty Williams obo Applt Zenith Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Appellants Mediation questionnaire submitted on 4/21/22; did not have copy of Order being appealed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: Dear Jeffrey J. Williams: The copy of your notice of appeal filed in the superior court was not accompanied by the statutory filing fee of $775, as required by rule 8.100(b)(1) of the California Rules of Court. Your appeal may be dismissed within 15 days of this notice unless you either transmit the filing fee or show good cause why the payment of said fee should be excused. If you are self-represented and are in need of guidance with your appeal, please refer to the California Appellate Courts Self-Help Resource Center website at https://selfhelp.appellate.courts.ca.gov/ Questions can also be addressed to the Civil Team at (559) 442-2754.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: the parties and Superior Court notifying that the mediation questionnaires are due within 10 days; Civil Case Information statement remains due 15 days after the superior court sends notification.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Atty Williams obo Zenith Insurance Company appeals from 3/17/22 Order re: Motion hearing Tax Costs.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Tulare County Superior Court - Main (Visalia); County: Tulare; Trial Court Case Number: VCU277573; Trial Court Judge: Mathias, David

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hettinga Transportation Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where ZENITH INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OBERRECHT KIMBERLY SUZANNE