This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 08/15/2022 at 02:04:47 (UTC).

ZB N.A. v. Meruelo et al.

Case Summary

On 11/09/2021 ZB N A filed an Other lawsuit against Meruelo. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Doyle, John. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6522

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Doyle, John

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

ZB N.A.

Defendants and Appellants

Richard Meruelo

Meruelo Properties, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Michael Barrett Fisher

Attorney at Buchalter Nemer

1000 Wilshire Blvd. Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Paul S. Marks

Attorney at Neufeld Marks

250 E. 1St Street Suite 1101

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.; Notes: *No filing fee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: Appellant's motion to vacate dismissal was received and filed on January 12, 2022. The appeal was dismissed by order dated December 28, 2022. This court's order became final as to this court on January 27, 2022, thirty (30) days after its filing (see Rule 8.264(b), California Rules of Court). This court is now without jurisdiction to rule on this motion. VerySent via email

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities or persons filed by:; Notes: Appellant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Motion to vacate dismissal filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Dismissed per rule 8.100(c); Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: It appearing that the appellant is in default pursuant to Rule 8.100(c), California Rules of Court, the appeal filed November 9, 2021, is dismissed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Richard Meruelo Attorney: Paul S. Marks Defendant and Appellant: Meruelo Properties, Inc. Attorney: Paul S. Marks

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Richard MerueloAttorney: Paul S. Marks Defendant and Appellant: Meruelo Properties, Inc.Attorney: Paul S. Marks

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: Appellant (November 9, 2021 by Richard Meruelo et al. ) is in default for failure to file a Case Information Statement pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 8.100(g).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee receivedSent notice via email to all parties

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed on November 9, 2021 by Richard Meruelo et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BC679554; Trial Court Judge: Doyle, John

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MERUELO PROPERTIES INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARKS PAUL S.