This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/20/2023 at 10:02:11 (UTC).

Zaldivar et al. v. Lee et al.

Case Summary

On 12/15/2021 Zaldivar filed an Other lawsuit against Lee. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Leis, Colin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7211

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Leis, Colin

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Appellants

Elva Zaldivar

Stephanie Zaldivar

Marina Zaldivar

Respondents and Defendants

Steve Lee

Tracy Lee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

Jose Miguel Flores

Attorney at CARRILLO LAW FIRM, LLP

1499 Huntington Drive, Ste. 402

South Pasadena, CA 91030

Michael Santino Carrillo

Attorney at CARRILLO LAW FIRM, LLP

1499 Huntington Dr Ste 402

South Pasadena, CA 91030

Luis A. Carrillo

Attorney at CARRILLO LAW FIRM, LLP

1499 Huntington Dr Suite No. 402

South Pasadena, CA 91030

Holly Noelle Boyer

Attorney at Esner Chang & Boyer

234 East Colorado Blvd., Suite 975

Pasadena, CA 91101

Laura Marie Jimenez

Attorney at CARRILLO LAW FIRM, LLP

1499 Huntington Dr # 402

South Pasadena, CA 91030

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Cameron William Thomas

Attorney at Musick Peeler & Garrett LLP

624 S Grand Ave Ste 2000

Los Angeles, CA 90017-3321

William A. Bossen

Attorney at Musick, Peeler & Garrett LLP

624 S. Grand Ave., Ste. 2000

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Cheryl Orr

Attorney at Musick, Peeler & Garrett LLP

624 S Grand Ave Ste 2000

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Jacquelene Anna Marcott

Attorney at MUSICK PEELER & GARRETT LLP

624 S. Grand Ave. Ste. 2000

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Voluntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: Pursuant to the stipulated request for dismissal of appeal filed November 23, 2022, the appeal filed December 15, 2021, is dismissed. Parties agree to bear their own costs on appeal. The remittitur shall issue forthwith (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.244(c)(2).)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for dismissal filed.; Notes: Stipulated request for dismissal of appeal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Elva Zaldivar Attorney: Michael Santino Carrillo Plaintiff and Appellant: Stephanie Zaldivar Attorney: Michael Santino Carrillo Plaintiff and Appellant: Marina Zaldivar Attorney: Michael Santino Carrillo TWO VOLUMES OF APPELLANTS' APPENDIXThree extensions granted for a total of 122 days: 05/26/2022 Stipulation of extension of time filed to:. Due on 08/01/2022 By 62 Day(s) 07/21/2022 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 08/31/2022 By 30 Day(s) 07/27/2022 Granted - extension of time. Due on 08/31/2022 By 30 Day(s) 08/23/2022 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 09/30/2022 By 30 Day(s) 08/24/2022 Granted - extension of time. Due on 09/30/2022 By 30 Day(s) [ The Court: the court does not intend to grant further extensions]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Elva ZaldivarAttorney: Michael Santino Carrillo Plaintiff and Appellant: Stephanie ZaldivarAttorney: Michael Santino Carrillo Plaintiff and Appellant: Marina ZaldivarAttorney: Michael Santino Carrillo; Notes: TWO VOLUMES OF APPELLANTS' APPENDIXThree extensions granted for a total of 122 days: 05/26/2022 Stipulation of extension of time filed to:. Due on 08/01/2022 By 62 Day(s) 07/21/2022 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 08/31/2022 By 30 Day(s) 07/27/2022 Granted - extension of time. Due on 08/31/2022 By 30 Day(s) 08/23/2022 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 09/30/2022 By 30 Day(s) 08/24/2022 Granted - extension of time. Due on 09/30/2022 By 30 Day(s) [ The Court: the court does not intend to grant further extensions]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.; Notes: AAO was due 9/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: [ The Court: the court does not intend to grant further extensions]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated Dec. 28, 2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Elva Zaldivar Attorney: Michael Santino Carrillo Plaintiff and Appellant: Stephanie Zaldivar Attorney: Michael Santino Carrillo Plaintiff and Appellant: Marina Zaldivar Attorney: Michael Santino Carrillo

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Elva ZaldivarAttorney: Michael Santino Carrillo Plaintiff and Appellant: Stephanie ZaldivarAttorney: Michael Santino Carrillo Plaintiff and Appellant: Marina ZaldivarAttorney: Michael Santino Carrillo

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check #1013 for $775

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee received

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed on December 15, 2021 by Elva Zaldivar et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 19STCV20803; Trial Court Judge: Leis, Colin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cheryl Orr

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARCOTT JACQUELENE A.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOSSEN WILLIAM A. ESQ

Latest cases represented by Lawyer THOMAS CAMERON W.